Lippert v. Caballos-Galendo et al
Plaintiff: Robert Scott Lippert
Defendant: John Doe 2, Idaho State Corrections Center, Ramond Caballos-Galendo, John Doe 3, Host, John Doe 1 and Amanda Gentry
Case Number: 1:2021cv00149
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-00175. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REJECTING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS: TRANSFERRING THE CASE to District of Idaho, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (cc: to plaintiff via USPS)(SG)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 21-35222 as to the #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Scott Lippert. (GMR)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL (21-35222) to Ninth Circuit by Plaintiff Robert Scott Lippert. (cc: USCA) (CDA) Modified on 3/26/2021 to add CCA# (GMR).
March 19, 2021 REFERRING #5 OBJECTION TO #4 Order Transferring Case to: Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Transfer to Idaho cancelled due to receipt of #5 Objection. cc: docket to plaintiff (GMR) Modified on 3/26/2021 to reflect mailing to plaintiff on 3/22/21 (GMR).
March 17, 2021 Case has been electronically transferred to the USDC for the District of Idaho, per #4 Order. (GMR- cc: pltf)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 OBJECTION TO #4 Order Transferring Case, filed by Plaintiff Robert Scott Lippert. Noted by clerk for: 3/12/2021. (GMR)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Idaho by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. Case will be transferred on 3/17/2021. The Court defers to the District of Idaho with respect to Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Proceed IFP. (GMR- cc: pltf)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Robert Scott Lippert. (KMC)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 3/18/2021 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (AMD - cc: Robert Lippert via USPS)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Robert Scott Lippert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lippert v. Caballos-Galendo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho State Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramond Caballos-Galendo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Host
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scott Lippert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?