Walsh v. House of Hounds, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Martin J Walsh
Defendant: Kayla Martin and House of Hounds, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00208
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin J Walsh. House of Hounds, LLC served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Malagon, Karla)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin J Walsh. Kayla Martin served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (Malagon, Karla)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to House of Hounds, LLC, Kayla Martin. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(alw)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS by Martin J Walsh. (Malagon, Karla)
June 11, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Raymond E. Patricco for all further proceedings. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:21-cv-00208-REP. (kt)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that due to Judge Bush taking inactive status, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Raymond E. Patricco for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (kt)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against House of Hounds, LLC and Kayla Martin, filed by Martin J Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gorman, Jeannie) Modified on 5/13/2021 include first defendant on complaint(kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. House of Hounds, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J Walsh
Represented By: Jeannie Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Martin
Represented By: Shelly Cozakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Hounds, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?