Humphreys v. Legacy JCTC, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elyse Humphreys
Defendant: Legacy JCTC, Inc., Jack Cooper Transport Company, Inc., Legacy CTAAN Corp., Joseph Bryant and North American Auto Transportation Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00259
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court will conduct a telephonic interim status conference on February 2, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. MST. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 10/29/2021. Discovery due by 3/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2022. ADR shall take place by 3/1/2022. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Elyse Humphreys. (Helfrich, Tim)
August 6, 2021 Filing 14 DISCOVERY PLAN by Elyse Humphreys . (Helfrich, Tim)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Pursuant to the agreements reached in the telephone scheduling conference held between counsel and Court staff on July 29, 2021, the parties shall file an amended litigation plan and amended discovery plan on or before August 6, 2021. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (aa)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Joseph Bryant, Legacy CTAAN Corp., Legacy JCTC, Inc.. (Greener, Richard)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN by Joseph Bryant, Legacy CTAAN Corp., Legacy JCTC, Inc. . (Greener, Richard)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Status Report Regarding Service of Summons and Complaint by Elyse Humphreys. (Helfrich, Tim)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jason Kafoury for Elyse Humphreys Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jason Kafoury. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BIDDC-2238616.)Tim J. Helfrich appearing for Plaintiff Elyse Humphreys. Responses due by 7/22/2021 (Helfrich, Tim)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2021 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before July 22, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (alw)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fourth Judicial District, Ada County, case number CV01-21-05234.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2234315.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Case Info Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Civil Summons to Defendants, #5 Exhibit D - Defendants' Notice of Appearance, #6 Exhibit E - Defendants' Civil Info Sheet, #7 Exhibit F - State Court's Notice of Scheduling Conference, #8 Exhibit G - Affidavits of Service on Defendants, #9 Exhibit H - State Court Docket Report)(Sokol, Slade)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Joseph Bryant, Legacy CTAAN Corp., Legacy JCTC, Inc..(Sokol, Slade)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Joseph Bryant, Elyse Humphreys, Legacy CTAAN Corp., Legacy JCTC, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/23/2021. (alw)
June 22, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Legacy CTAAN Corp., North American Auto Transportation Corp., Jack Cooper Transport Company, Inc., Joseph Bryant, Legacy JCTC, Inc. was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing with each state court document filed as a separate attachment rather than one grouped attachment.(alw)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Legacy CTAAN Corp., Legacy JCTC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Legacy JCHC Corp. for Legacy CTAAN Corp., Legacy JCTC, Inc.. (Sokol, Slade)
June 16, 2021 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Joseph Bryant served on 6/16/2021; Legacy CTAAN Corp. served on 6/16/2021; Legacy JCTC, Inc. served on 6/16/2021. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (alw)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Legacy CTAAN Corp., North American Auto Transportation Corp., Jack Cooper Transport Company, Inc., Joseph Bryant, Legacy JCTC, Inc.. (Sokol, Slade)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Fourth Judicial District, Ada County, case number CV01-21-05234.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2232157.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Notice of Removal)(Sokol, Slade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphreys v. Legacy JCTC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy JCTC, Inc.
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Cooper Transport Company, Inc.
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy CTAAN Corp.
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bryant
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Auto Transportation Corp.
Represented By: Slade Dean Sokol
Represented By: Richard H Greener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elyse Humphreys
Represented By: Jason Llewellyn Kafoury
Represented By: Tim J. Helfrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?