Sivak v. Nye
Plaintiff: Lacey Sivak
Defendant: Hon David C Nye
Case Number: 1:2021cv00278
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Intent to Appeal by Lacey Sivak re 10 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, (alw)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Lacey Sivak(alw)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Reconsideration. After careful consideration, the Court denies the plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's #8 Order denying the plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mem)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Reconsider re #8 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/26/2021 (alw)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mem)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Petitioners Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. 4 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee when Petitioner next receives funds in Petitioners inmate trust account. Within 60 days after entry of this Order, Petitioner must file an amended petition as described above. Signed by Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mem) Modified on 7/27/2021 (mem).
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Injunction/Protective Order by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/12/2021 (alw)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lacey Sivak. (alw)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lacey Sivak. Responses due by 8/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 envelope)(alw)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge M. Douglas Harpool from the Western District of Missouri. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (lm)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David C Nye filed by Lacey Sivak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lm)
July 1, 2021 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Harpool. Please use case number 1:21-cv-278-MDH on all future pleadings. (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sivak v. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon David C Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?