Wilfong v. City of Boise et al
Plaintiff: Julie Wilfong
Defendant: City of Boise, Ryan Lee, Cory Stambaugh, Robert Rainford, Jordan McCarthy, Coy Bruner and Does I-X
Case Number: 1:2021cv00298
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Wilfong. Cory Stambaugh waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Karel, Renee)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Wilfong. Robert Rainford waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Karel, Renee)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Wilfong. Jordan McCarthy waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Karel, Renee)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Wilfong. Coy Bruner waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Karel, Renee)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Wilfong. Ryan Lee waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Karel, Renee)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Wilfong. City of Boise waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Karel, Renee)
August 17, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #3 Notice (Other), filed by Julie Wilfong was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing using the event Waiver of Service Executed under Service of Process category.(alw)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Julie Wilfong Executed Waivers of Service of Summons to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Waiver-City Of Boise, #2 Waiver-Ryan Lee, #3 Waiver-Coy Bruner, #4 Waiver-Jordan McCarthy, #5 Waiver-Robert Rainford, #6 Waiver-Cory Stambaugh)(Karel, Renee)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Coy Bruner, City of Boise, Ryan Lee, Jordan McCarthy, Robert Rainford, Cory Stambaugh. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(alw)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2246680.), filed by Julie Wilfong. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Cover Sheet)(Mimura, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilfong v. City of Boise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Wilfong
Represented By: Renee Karel
Represented By: Susan L Mimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Stambaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rainford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coy Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?