Filler, et al. v. Dwello, et al.
Plaintiff: John Filler and Leslie Filler
Defendant: Miren M. Unsworth, Susan Dwello, Jasmine Olmedo, Marinda Squibb and Jane Does I-XX
Case Number: 1:2021cv00391
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marinda Squibb, Susan Dwello, Miren M. Unsworth, Jasmine Olmedo. Marinda Squibb waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022; Susan Dwello waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022; Miren M. Unsworth waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022; Jasmine Olmedo waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Reed, Dayton)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/1/2021 09:30 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 1/6/2022 10:30 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W. Dale. New call-in information will be provided prior to hearing by way of additional notice. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 12/30/2021. (at)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by John Filler. (Kiiha, Jay)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on December 1, 2021, at 9:30 AM mountain time. All parties shall use the Courts AT&T teleconferencing line to connect to this hearing, by dialing: 1-888-273-3658, Access Code: 5475731, Security Code: 5637. On or before November 24, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(lm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2279424.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Kiiha, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Filler, et al. v. Dwello, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Filler
Represented By: Jay J Kiiha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Filler
Represented By: Jay J Kiiha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miren M. Unsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Dwello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Olmedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinda Squibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does I-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?