Sellers v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Benjamin Allan Sellers
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00414
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lane Martin on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Martin, Justin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne P Rodriguez on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Rodriguez, Joanne)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner will be allowed to proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 28, 2021 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 7 Consent Filed was filed incorrectly in this case. Please refer to Dkt 8 for the correct filing.(lm)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(lm) (jd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2021: #1 Notice of Assignment) (lm).
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 DISREGARD - Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (lm) Modified on 10/29/2021, see corrective entry (jd).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kilolo Kijakazi and counsel for Benjamin Allan Sellers re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/12/2021. (jd)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jd)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Barbara F Harper appearing for Plaintiff Benjamin Allan Sellers. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Harper, Barbara)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Benjamin Allan Sellers This is a sealed document.. (Harper, Barbara)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW , filed by Benjamin Allan Sellers. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Harper, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Allan Sellers
Represented By: Barbara F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?