Andrianumearisata v. Twin Falls Division of Motor Vehicles
Plaintiff: Artem Andrianumearisata
Defendant: Twin Falls Division of Motor Vehicles
Case Number: 1:2021cv00429
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Resume Pursuance to the Court. Originate Fee Compensation. by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata. Responses due by 1/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proclamation of Artem Andrianumearisata, #2 copy of envelope)(lm)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 Second REQUEST to issue summons by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata for (Attachments: #1 request)(alw)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kmp)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to Originate a Fee Compensation by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata. Responses due by 11/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(kmp) Modified on 11/2/2021 (kmp). Modified on 11/2/2021 to show corrected filing date (kmp).
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Twin Falls Division of Motor Vehicles n, filed by Artem Andrianumearisata. (Attachments: #1 Filing the complaint, #2 Identifying Case Assignment, #3 Identifying and Initiating discovery, #4 Proposed Summons)(kmp) Modified on 11/2/2021 to show corrected filing date(kmp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrianumearisata v. Twin Falls Division of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artem Andrianumearisata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Falls Division of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?