Andrianumearisata v. Koopmans
Plaintiff: Artem Andrianumearisata
Defendant: Sgt. Aaron Koopmans
Case Number: 1:2021cv00443
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Resume Pursuance by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata. Responses due by 1/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proclamation)(kt)
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 THIRD Supportive Discovery by Artem Andrianumearisata (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope)(kt)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 SECOND Supportive Discovery by Artem Andrianumearisata (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope)(kt)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata to Issue the Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Envelope)(kt)
November 26, 2021 Filing 5 Supportive Discovery by Aaron Koopmans. (jd)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Proper Filing by Artem Andrianumearisata. (jd)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kmp) Modified on 11/15/2021 for corrected docket number (kmp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrianumearisata v. Koopmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artem Andrianumearisata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Aaron Koopmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?