Andrianumearisata v. Idaho Department of Labor
Plaintiff: Artem Andrianumearisata
Defendant: Idaho Department of Labor
Case Number: 1:2021cv00451
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPORTIVE DISCOVERY by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata re #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(lm) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/23/2021 to include missing pages) (kt)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Second Request to Issue the Summons by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata (Attachments: #1 Summons)(lm)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Proper filing by Artem Andrianumearisata. (jd)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (kmp)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 MERE PURSUANCE MOTION by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata. Responses due by 12/8/2021 (kmp)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Idaho Department of Labor, filed by Artem Andrianumearisata. (Attachments: #1 Filing the Complaint, #2 Identifying Case Assignment, #3 Identifying and Initiating discovery, #4 Proposed Summons)(kmp)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 Petition to Originate a Fee Compensation by Plaintiff Artem Andrianumearisata. Responses due by 12/8/2021 (kmp) Modified on 11/17/2021 to reflect title of document(kmp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrianumearisata v. Idaho Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artem Andrianumearisata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?