Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Little et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Humane Society of the United States, Sierra Club, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Footloose Montana, Global Indigenous Council, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Trap Free Montana and Wolves of the Rockies
Defendant: Governor of Idaho Brad Little, Dir., ID F&G Ed Schriever, Derick Attebury, Dave Bobbitt, Greg Cameron, Lane Clezie, Ron Davies, Don Ebert, Tim Murphy, Brad Little and Ed Schriever
Case Number: 1:2021cv00479
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Niemeyer _ Second Decl, #2 Exhibit Proulx _ Second Decl, #3 Exhibit Servheen _ Second Decl)(Scrimshaw, Benjamin)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Derick Attebury, Dave Bobbitt, Greg Cameron, Lane Clezie, Ron Davies, Don Ebert, Brad Little, Tim Murphy, Ed Schriever. Replies due by 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Aber, #2 Declaration of Toby Boudreau, #3 Declaration of Brian Johnson, #4 Declaration of Kathleen Trever, #5 Declaration of Katherine Oelrich, #6 Exhibits A-D to Declaration of Katherine Oelrich, #7 Exhibits E-L to Declaration of Katherine Oelrich)(Trever, Kathleen)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 1/14/2022 Replies due by 1/28/2022. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/31/2022. Per Order #18 . (klw)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - The motion (Dkt. #17 ) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiffs reply in support of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is extended until January 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Benjamin James Scrimshaw appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies. Responses due by 2/1/2022 (Scrimshaw, Benjamin)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 consent)(alw)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen Hugh Moroney on behalf of All Defendants (Moroney, Owen)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Motion (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED and the Stipulation is APPROVED. The following deadlines are hereby set:Defendants response to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is due by January 14, 2022.Plaintiffs reply, if any, is due by January 24, 2022. The parties have up through and including January 7, 2022, within which to sign the consent to proceed form and return it to the Clerk as directed in the Notice of Assignment. (Dkt. #12 .). Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. ((alw)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Derick Attebury, Dave Bobbitt, Greg Cameron, Center for Biological Diversity, Lane Clezie, Ron Davies, Don Ebert, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Brad Little, Tim Murphy, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Ed Schriever, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies re #11 MOTION to Clarify /Set Schedule for Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Unopposed], #1 Complaint,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/22/2022. (alw)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Clarify /Set Schedule for Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Unopposed] Kathleen Elizabeth Trever appearing for Defendants Derick Attebury, Dave Bobbitt, Greg Cameron, Lane Clezie, Ron Davies, Don Ebert, Brad Little, Tim Murphy, Ed Schriever. Responses due by 1/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Stipulation for Scheduling of Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Trever, Kathleen)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE by Derick Attebury, Dave Bobbitt, Greg Cameron, Lane Clezie, Ron Davies, Don Ebert, Brad Little, Tim Murphy, Ed Schriever Notice of Waiver of Service of Summonses and Time for Answer (Attachments: #1 Stipulation for Waiver of Service of Summonses and Time for Answer)(Trever, Kathleen)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Southern Division and case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale. Please use case number 1:21-cv-479-CWD for all future filings. (alw)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Brad Little. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Derick Attebury, Dave Bobbitt, Greg Cameron, Lane Clezie, Ron Davies, Don Ebert, Tim Murphy, Ed Schriever, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(alw)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 #4 #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Shiloh Silvan Hernandez, Emily Qiu, Benjamin James Scrimshaw for Center for Biological Diversity, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Dana M Johnson appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies. Responses due by 12/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support of Motion, #2 Brett Haverstick Declaration, #3 Gary Macfarlane Declaration, #4 Janet Torline Declaration, #5 Kevin Brown Declaration, #6 Larry Campbell Declaration, #7 Marty Almquist Declaration, #8 Paul Sieracki Declaration, #9 Rain Declaration, #10 Suzanne Stone Declaration, #11 Carter Niemeyer Declaration, #12 Gilbert Proulx Declaration, #13 Benjamin Scrimshaw Declaration, #14 Christopher Servheen Declaration, #15 Winston Vickers Declaration)(Johnson, Dana)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Emily T. Qiu. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2312820.)Dana M Johnson appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies. Responses due by 12/27/2021 (Johnson, Dana)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Shiloh S. Hernandez. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2312816.)Dana M Johnson appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies. Responses due by 12/27/2021 (Johnson, Dana)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Benjamin J. Scrimshaw. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2312811.)Dana M Johnson appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies. Responses due by 12/27/2021 (Johnson, Dana)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Footloose Montana, Friends of the Clearwater, Gallatin Wildlife Association, Global Indigenous Council, Humane Society of the United States, International Wildlife Coexistence Network, Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment, Sierra Club, Trap Free Montana, Western Watersheds Project, Wilderness Watch, Wolves of the Rockies. (Johnson, Dana)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2312722.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Brad Little Summons, #3 Summons Ed Schriever Summons, #4 Summons Derick Attebury Summons, #5 Summons Dave Bobbitt Summons, #6 Summons Greg Cameron Summons, #7 Summons Lane Clezie Summons, #8 Summons Ron Davies Summons, #9 Summons Don Ebert Summons, #10 Summons Tim Murphy Summons)(Johnson, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Little et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Clearwater
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gallatin Wildlife Association
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Watersheds Project
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Watch
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Footloose Montana
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Indigenous Council
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Wildlife Coexistence Network
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nimiipuu Protecting the Environment
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trap Free Montana
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolves of the Rockies
Represented By: Dana M Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin James Scrimshaw
Represented By: Emily Qiu
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of Idaho Brad Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir., ID F&G Ed Schriever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derick Attebury
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Bobbitt
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cameron
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Clezie
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Davies
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Ebert
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Murphy
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Little
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Schriever
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Trever
Represented By: Owen Hugh Moroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?