Rocket Mortgage, LLC v. Franke, et al.
Plaintiff: Rocket Mortgage, LLC and Quicken Loans, LLC
Defendant: Sean Franke, Julie Franke and Wings & Wheels, Inc
Case Number: 1:2022cv00025
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims in this case are dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney fees to any party. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sean Franke. (Dorman, James)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before June 29, 2022, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
February 21, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wings & Wheels, Inc. (Dorman, James)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before March 22, 2022, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Julie Franke, Sean Franke, Wings & Wheels, Inc. and counsel for Rocket Mortgage, LLC, re #1 Complaint and #7 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/19/2022. (jd)
February 18, 2022 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
February 17, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Julie Franke, Sean Franke, Wings & Wheels, Inc.(Dorman, James)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocket Mortgage, LLC. Wings & Wheels, Inc served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Rojas, Marcello)
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocket Mortgage, LLC. Sean Franke served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Rojas, Marcello)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocket Mortgage, LLC. Julie Franke served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Rojas, Marcello)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Rojas, Marcello)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for Sean Franke, #2 Summons for Wings & Wheels Inc.)(jd)
January 21, 2022 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Rocket Mortgage, LLC is not filled out. The filing party shall re-submit the civil cover sheet for filing.(jd)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2333725.), filed by Rocket Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons for Sean Franke, #3 Summons Summons for Julie Franke, #4 Summons Summons for Wings & Wheels)(Rojas, Marcello)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocket Mortgage, LLC v. Franke, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocket Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Marcello Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quicken Loans, LLC
Represented By: Marcello Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Franke
Represented By: James Edward Dorman
Represented By: Justin Ray Volle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Franke
Represented By: James Edward Dorman
Represented By: Justin Ray Volle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wings & Wheels, Inc
Represented By: James Edward Dorman
Represented By: Justin Ray Volle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?