The United States v. State of Idaho
Plaintiff: The United States and United States of America
Defendant: State of Idaho
Intervenor Defendant: Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature
Amicus Curiae: New York, State of, California, State of, Connecticut, State of, Colorado, State of, Delaware, State of, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, Nevada, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oregon, State of, Pennsylvania, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Washington, State of, Washington DC, American Center for Law & Justice, American College of Emergency Physicians, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, National Medical Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Public Health Association, American Medical Association,, The American Hospital Association, The Association of American Medical Colleges, State of Indiana, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Montana, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming and State of Nebraska
Case Number: 1:2022cv00329
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 RESPONSE to Motion re #97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Non-Opposition) filed by State of Idaho. Replies due by 10/12/2022.(Church, Brian)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State of Idaho.(Church, Brian)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. Upon consideration of the United States Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule Regarding Motions for Reconsideration, and finding good cause, IT IS ORDERED that the United States motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (alw)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION for Reconsideration Brian V Church appearing for Defendant State of Idaho. Responses due by 10/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of State of Idaho's Motion to Reconsider)(Church, Brian)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE to Motion re #99 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Partial Non-Opposition filed by State of Idaho. Replies due by 9/30/2022.(Church, Brian)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Christopher A. Eiswerth appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 10/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Correspondence)(Eiswerth, Christopher)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE by United States of America of Factual Clarification (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dr. Fleisher (Second Supplemental))(Schwei, Daniel)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #95 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Daniel W. Bower appearing for Intervenor Defendant Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature. Responses due by 9/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bower, Daniel)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/22/22 before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Court Reporter Tamara Hohenleitner, Email tammy_hohenleitner@id.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. This transcript is not available to the general public and as such is sealed until release of transcript restriction re #92 Motion Hearing. Redaction Request due 9/15/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2022. (th)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. #17 ) is GRANTED. This preliminary injunction is effective immediately and shall remain in full force and effect through the date on which judgment is entered in this case. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE by State of Idaho of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - U.S. District Court for Northern District of Texas Decision)(Church, Brian)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE filed by Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature Objection to Proposed Order [Dkt. 17-2]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Fall-Back Order - redline, #2 Exhibit 2 Proposed Fall-Back Order - clean, #3 Exhibit 3 EMTALA)(Bower, Daniel)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B Lynn Winmill: A Motion Hearing was held on 8/22/2022 re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. A written decision is forthcoming. (Court Reporter Tammy Hohenleitner.) (jlg)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE by State of Idaho Notice of Appearance Special Deputy Attorney General Clay R. Smith (Church, Brian)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re 89 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed by State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Indiana, State of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Montana, State of North Dakota, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming, State of Nebraska. (Fisher, Thomas) Modified on 8/25/2022 to add party (alw).
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: #87 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Indiana and 16 Other States as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendant is GRANTED. Amici are directed to file their [87-2] Proposed Brief. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jsv)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: A Motion Hearing is set for 8/22/2022 at 9:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 2 before Judge B Lynn Winmill. Members of the public may attend the hearing remotely. Remote access will be audio only - there will not be video. To access an audio feed from the hearing, members of the public may call this number: 208-684-0990. Then, when they are prompted for the conference ID, they should enter 238 965 497#.(jlg)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Indiana and 16 Other States as Amici Curiae in Support of Defendant Thomas Molnar Fisher appearing for Amicus State of Indiana. Responses due by 9/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Fisher, Thomas)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Ex. H, Supplemental Fleisher Declaration, #3 Ex. I, Supplemental Corrigan Declaration, #4 Ex. J, Huntsberger Declaration, #5 Ex. K, Supplemental Cooper Declaration, #6 Ex. L)(Newman, Lisa)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State of Indiana. Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of States of Indiana, Alabama, Arkansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, North Dakota, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virginia, and Wyoming. (Fisher, Thomas)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Maher Mahmood for American Academy of Family Physicians,Maher Mahmood for American Academy of Pediatrics,Maher Mahmood for American College of Emergency Physicians,Maher Mahmood for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists,Maher Mahmood for American Medical Association,,Maher Mahmood for American Public Health Association,Maher Mahmood for Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians,Maher Mahmood for National Hispanic Medical Association,Maher Mahmood for National Medical Association,Maher Mahmood for Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Thomas Molnar Fisher for State of Indiana Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Maher Mahmood. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2438637.)Maher Mahmood appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/9/2022 (Mahmood, Maher)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Thomas M. Fisher. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2437960.)Thomas Molnar Fisher appearing for Amicus State of Indiana. Responses due by 9/8/2022 (Fisher, Thomas)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re 76 Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief, #74 MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by American Center for Law & Justice Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Response. (Summers, Olivia)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B Lynn Winmill: An informal Video Status Conference was held on 8/18/2022. (Court Reporter/ESR Not recorded.) Hearing Not Recorded. (jlg)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Dkt. #77 ). The State of Idaho shall answer or other respond by September 23, 2022. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (hgp)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (unopposed) Brian V Church appearing for Defendant State of Idaho. Responses due by 9/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Church, Brian)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The American Center for Law & Justice's #74 Motion for Leave to file Amicus Brief in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. The ACLJ is directed to formally file its [74-1] Proposed Brief. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jsv)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: Before the Court is the Idaho Legislature's Motion for Leave to File Legal Arguments #69 . Having considered the Legislature's Motion, the Court declines at this juncture to modify the conditions it imposed in its earlier Order #27 allowing the Legislature to permissively intervene. Allowing the Legislature to file an additional brief past the deadline of the expedited briefing schedule would unduly prejudice the United States, which must file its reply brief by 12:00 pm MST, on August 19, 2022. In addition, the Legislatures total briefing would exceed not only the 15-page limit imposed by the Court but would also exceed the 20-page limit imposed by the Local Rules to which both the United States and the State of Idaho have adhered. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Legislature's Motion for Leave to File Legal Arguments #69 is DENIED. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jsv)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION to File Amicus Brief Olivia F. Summers appearing for Amicus American Center for Law & Justice. Responses due by 9/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Summers, Olivia)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Legislatures request for an evidentiary hearingis DENIED. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (alw)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Wayne Foutz on behalf of State of Idaho (Foutz, Alan)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature. Replies due by 8/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reynolds Declaration, #2 Affidavit Harder Declaration, #3 Exhibit Idaho Report of Induced Termination of Pregnancy, #4 Exhibit Idaho Abortion Reporting Response, #5 Affidavit French Declaration, #6 Affidavit Loebs Declaration)(Bower, Daniel)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #67 #68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for American Academy of Family Physicians,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for American Academy of Pediatrics,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for American College of Emergency Physicians,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for American Medical Association,,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for American Public Health Association,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for National Hispanic Medical Association,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for National Medical Association,John Lewis,Jeffrey B. Dubner for Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File LEGAL ARGUMENTS Daniel W. Bower appearing for Intervenor Defendant Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature. Responses due by 9/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Legislatures unique legal arguments)(Bower, Daniel)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by John T. Lewis. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2437139.)John Lewis appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/7/2022 (Lewis, John)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jeffrey B. Dubner. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2437111.)Jeffrey B. Dubner appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/7/2022 (Dubner, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Idaho. Replies due by 8/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kraig White MD, #2 Declaration of Randy Rodriguez)(Church, Brian)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature. Replies due by 8/30/2022.(Bower, Daniel)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Laura Hernandez for American Center for Law & Justice Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The American Hospital Association, The Association of American Medical Colleges /Amicus Brief re Docket 39. (Olson, Wendy)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Replies due by 8/30/2022.(Selden, Shannon)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Laura B. Hernandez. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436596.)Laura Hernandez appearing for Amicus American Center for Law & Justice. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Hernandez, Laura)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #53 #54 #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for American Academy of Family Physicians,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for American Academy of Pediatrics,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for American College of Emergency Physicians,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for American Medical Association,,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for American Public Health Association,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for National Hispanic Medical Association,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for National Medical Association,Shannon Rose Selden,Leah S. Martin,Adam B. Aukland-Peck for Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by California, State of, Colorado, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, Nevada, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, New York, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oregon, State of, Pennsylvania, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Washington DC, Washington, State of. Replies due by 8/30/2022.(Etlinger, Laura)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: #50 American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine's Motion to file Amicus Brief is GRANTED. Amici are directed to formally file their [50-1] Proposed Brief. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jsv)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: #45 The States of California, New York, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, and Washington, and Washington, D.C.'s Motion to file Amicus Brief is GRANTED. Amici States are directed to formally file their Proposed Brief [45-1]. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jsv)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: #39 The American Hospital Association and The Association of American Medical Colleges' Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae is GRANTED. Amici are directed to formally file their [39-1] Proposed Brief. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jsv)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Adam Aukland-Peck. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436445.)Adam B. Aukland-Peck appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Aukland-Peck, Adam)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Leah Martin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436438.)Leah S. Martin appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Martin, Leah)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Shannon Rose Selden. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436424.)Shannon Rose Selden appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Selden, Shannon)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #40 #42 #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Amanda K Rice,Jacob M Roth,Charlotte H Taylor for The American Hospital Association,Amanda K Rice,Jacob M Roth,Charlotte H Taylor for The Association of American Medical Colleges Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ERRATA by Amicus Parties California, State of, Colorado, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, Nevada, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, New York, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oregon, State of, Pennsylvania, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Washington DC, Washington, State of re #45 MOTION to File Amicus Brief . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support corrected signature blocks on amicus brief and motion)(Etlinger, Laura)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #47 #48 #49 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND MOTION FOR WAIVER OF FEE by Shannon Rose Selden. filed by American Public Health Association, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, American Academy of Family Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, American College of Emergency Physicians, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Medical Association, American Medical Association,, American Academy of Pediatrics was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing parties shall re-submit their motions for pro hac and pay the filing fee.(alw)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to File Amicus Brief (UNOPPOSED) Shannon Rose Selden appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Selden, Shannon)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND MOTION FOR WAIVER OF FEE by Adam Aukland-Peck. Adam B. Aukland-Peck appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Aukland-Peck, Adam)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND MOTION FOR WAIVER OF FEE by Leah Martin. Leah S. Martin appearing for Amicus Parties American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Medical Association,, American Public Health Association, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, National Hispanic Medical Association, National Medical Association, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Martin, Leah)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE AND MOTION FOR WAIVER OF FEE by Shannon Rose Selden. Shannon Rose Selden appearing for Amicus Parties American College of Emergency Physicians, Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, National Medical Association, National Hispanic Medical Association, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Public Health Association, American Medical Association,. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Selden, Shannon)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF filed by State of Idaho re: letter brief requested by Dkt. 30. (Church, Brian)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to File Amicus Brief Laura Etlinger appearing for Amicus Parties California, State of, Colorado, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, Nevada, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, New York, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oregon, State of, Pennsylvania, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Washington DC, Washington, State of. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support proposed amicus brief)(Etlinger, Laura)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF filed by Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature Regarding Live Testimony at August 22 Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (Bower, Daniel)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Charlotte H. Taylor. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436127.)Wendy Olson appearing for Amicus The American Hospital Association and The Association of American Medical Colleges. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Olson, Wendy) Modified on 8/16/2022 to change filing party name (alw).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jacob M. Roth. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436117.)Wendy Olson appearing for Amicus The American Hospital Association and The Association of American Medical Colleges. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Olson, Wendy) Modified on 8/16/2022 to change filing party name (alw).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #33 #34 #35 #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jay Alan Sekulow,Jordan A. Sekulow,Stuart Roth,Olivia F. Summers for American Center for Law & Justice Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amanda K. Rice. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436111.)Wendy Olson appearing for Amicus The American Hospital Association and The Association of American Medical Colleges. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Olson, Wendy) Modified on 8/16/2022 to change filing party name (alw).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae Wendy Olson appearing for Amicus The American Hospital Association and The Association of American Medical Colleges. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae)(Olson, Wendy) Modified on 8/16/2022 to change party filed name (alw).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Laura Etlinger for California, State of,Laura Etlinger for Colorado, State of,Laura Etlinger for Connecticut, State of,Laura Etlinger for Delaware, State of,Laura Etlinger for Hawaii, State of,Laura Etlinger for Illinois, State of,Laura Etlinger for Maine, State of,Laura Etlinger for Maryland, State of,Laura Etlinger for Massachusetts, State of,Laura Etlinger for Michigan, State of,Laura Etlinger for Minnesota, State of,Laura Etlinger for Nevada, State of,Laura Etlinger for New Jersey, State of,Laura Etlinger for New Mexico, State of,Laura Etlinger for New York, State of,Laura Etlinger for North Carolina, State of,Laura Etlinger for Oregon, State of,Laura Etlinger for Pennsylvania, State of,Laura Etlinger for Rhode Island, State of,Laura Etlinger for Washington DC,Laura Etlinger for Washington, State of Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Olivia F. Summers. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436080.)Olivia F. Summers appearing for Amicus American Center for Law & Justice. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Summers, Olivia)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF filed by United States of America Regarding Live Testimony at August 22 Preliminary Injunction Hearing. (Schwei, Daniel)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stuart J. Roth. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436050.)Stuart Roth appearing for Amicus American Center for Law & Justice. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Roth, Stuart)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jordan A. Sekulow. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436031.)Jordan A. Sekulow appearing for Amicus American Center for Law & Justice. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Sekulow, Jordan)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jay Alan Sekulow. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2436019.)Jay Alan Sekulow appearing for Amicus American Center for Law & Justice. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Sekulow, Jay)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Laura Etlinger. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2435922.)Laura Etlinger appearing for Amicus Parties New York, State of, California, State of, Connecticut, State of, Colorado, State of, Delaware, State of, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, Nevada, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oregon, State of, Pennsylvania, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Washington, State of, Washington DC. Responses due by 9/6/2022 (Etlinger, Laura)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Joan Elizabeth Callahan on behalf of State of Idaho (Callahan, Joan)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B Lynn Winmill: Video Status Conference was held on 8/15/2022. (Court Reporter Tammy Hohenleitner.) (jlg)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: The Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2022 is rescheduled to begin at 9:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 2 before Judge B Lynn Winmill. (jlg)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The Court amends its oral order, made during the informal status conference today, as follows: The Legislature's deadline for submitting affidavits in supports of its response shall be due by 12:00 p.m., Mountain Time, on Wednesday, August 17, 2022. The Legislature's deadline to submit its brief opposing the United States Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall remain the same: that brief is due on August 16, 2022. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mls)
August 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mls)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian V Church on behalf of State of Idaho (Church, Brian)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Expedited MOTION to Intervene filed by Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/12/2022.(Bower, Daniel)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: If the Idaho Legislature wishes to file its optional reply brief in support of its motion to intervene (filed at Dkt. 15), it must do so by 5:00 p.m. Mountain Time today, August 11, 2022. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (mls)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 Expedited MOTION to Intervene filed by United States of America. Replies due by 8/24/2022.(Deffebach, Anna)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE OF HEARING regarding #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: A Motion Hearing is set for 8/22/2022 at 9:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 2 before Judge B Lynn Winmill. (jlg)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by State of Idaho re #15 Expedited MOTION to Intervene State of Idaho's Non-Opposition (Larrondo, Megan)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED ORDER re #14 Order. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (alw)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: The parties shall respond to the motion to intervene (Dkt. #15 ) by Wednesday, August 10, 2022. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (hgp)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Lisa Newman appearing for Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 8/29/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Ex. A, Fleisher Declaration, #4 Fleisher Appendix, Pt. 1, #5 Fleisher Appendix, Pt. 2, #6 Ex. B, Corrigan Declaration, #7 Ex. C, Cooper Declaration, #8 Ex. D, Seyb Declaration, #9 Ex. E, Wright Declaration, #10 Ex. F, Shadle Declaration, #11 Ex. G, Newman Declaration, #12 Newman Appendix, Pt. 1, #13 Newman Appendix, Pt. 2)(Newman, Lisa)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Expedite Idaho Legislatures Motion to Intervene Daniel W. Bower appearing for Intervenor Defendant Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature. Responses due by 8/29/2022 (Bower, Daniel)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Expedited MOTION to Intervene Daniel W. Bower, Monte N Stewart appearing for Intervenor Defendant Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature. Responses due by 8/29/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit 1 Proposed Answer)(Bower, Daniel)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. An amicus curiae supporting the United States of America must file its brief, accompanied by a motion for filing, no later than August 15, 2022. An amicus curiae supporting the State of Idaho must file its brief, accompanied by a motion for filing, no later than 12:00 MDT on August 19, 2022. An amicus curiae that does not support either party must file its brief no later than no later than 12:00 MDT on August 19, 2022. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (alw)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B Lynn Winmill: A Status Conference was held via Zoom on 8/5/2022. Appearing on behalf of Plaintiff: Lisa Newman, Daniel Schwei, and Brian Netter. Appearing on behalf of Defendant: Megan Larrondo and Steve Olsen. The Court discussed a briefing schedule regarding Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (see Dkt. 13). Hearing was held informally and was not recorded. Time: 1:04-1:14p.m. (jlg)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER: In accordance with the agreement reached by the parties and discussed with the Court at an informal status conference, the following briefing schedule is ordered. The United States will file its motion for injunctive relief on Monday, August 8. The State of Idaho will file its response on Tuesday, August 16. The United States will file its reply brief by 12:00 pm MDT on Friday, August 19. The Court will have a hearing on the motion, which will be set by separate notice, on August 22. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (hgp)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lamar Olsen on behalf of State of Idaho (Olsen, Steven)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for State of Idaho, United States of America re #1 Complaint, #9 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/4/2022. (alw)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian David Netter on behalf of United States of America (Netter, Brian)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Ann Larrondo on behalf of State of Idaho (Larrondo, Megan)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Nestler on behalf of United States of America (Nestler, Emily)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Eiswerth on behalf of United States of America (Eiswerth, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Idaho served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022. (Newman, Lisa)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Schwei on behalf of United States of America (Schwei, Daniel)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to State of Idaho. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ac)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of The United States (Straus Harris, Julie)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Lynn Deffebach on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Deffebach, Anna)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Idaho, filed by The United States. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Counsel attachment, #3 Summons)(Newman, Lisa) (Attachment 1 cover sheet replaced with PDF that cannot be edited on 8/3/2022) (ac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States v. State of Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Lisa Newman
Represented By: Anna Lynn Deffebach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian David Netter
Represented By: Daniel Schwei
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Represented By: Lisa Newman
Represented By: Anna Lynn Deffebach
Represented By: Christopher A. Eiswerth
Represented By: Emily Nestler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Idaho
Represented By: Brian V Church
Represented By: Clay R Smith
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Represented By: Ingrid C Batey
Represented By: Joan Elizabeth Callahan
Represented By: Megan Ann Larrondo
Represented By: Steven Lamar Olsen
Represented By: Alan Wayne Foutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Speaker of the Idaho House of Representatives Scott Bedke, Idaho Senate President Pro Tempore Chuck Winder, and the Sixty-Sixth Idaho Legislature
Represented By: Monte N Stewart
Represented By: Daniel W. Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Connecticut, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colorado, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Delaware, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hawaii, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maine, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maryland, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michigan, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Minnesota, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nevada, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Mexico, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Carolina, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oregon, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pennsylvania, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rhode Island, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington, State of
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington DC
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Center for Law & Justice
Represented By: Jay Alan Sekulow
Represented By: Laura Hernandez
Represented By: Jordan A. Sekulow
Represented By: Olivia F. Summers
Represented By: Stuart Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Emergency Physicians
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Idaho Chapter of the American College of Emergency Physicians
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Medical Association
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Hispanic Medical Association
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Family Physicians
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association,
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Represented By: Adam B. Aukland-Peck
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: John Lewis
Represented By: Leah S. Martin
Represented By: Maher Mahmood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The American Hospital Association
Represented By: Amanda K Rice
Represented By: Charlotte H Taylor
Represented By: Jacob M Roth
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Association of American Medical Colleges
Represented By: Amanda K Rice
Represented By: Charlotte H Taylor
Represented By: Jacob M Roth
Represented By: Wendy Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Indiana
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Alabama
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Kentucky
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Montana
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of North Dakota
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of South Dakota
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Texas
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Utah
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?