Bryan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Kelly Nicole Bryan
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00358
Filed: August 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Mullen on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Mullen, Michael)
October 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Gealy England on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (England, Christine)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(alw)
August 18, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Commissioner, #2 Summons Attorney General) (ac)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION - IT IS THEREFORE HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioners In Forma Pauperis Application (Dkt. #3 ) is GRANTED and this action shall proceed without the payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
August 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kelly Nicole Bryan, Commissioner of Social Security re #1 Petition for Review. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/8/2022. (ac)
August 18, 2022 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
August 17, 2022 Filing 3 Statement of Social Security Number by Kelly Nicole Bryan This is a sealed document.. (Parkinson, Brad)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Brad D Parkinson appearing for Petitioner Kelly Nicole Bryan. Responses due by 9/7/2022 (Parkinson, Brad)
August 17, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW , filed by Kelly Nicole Bryan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Parkinson, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kelly Nicole Bryan
Represented By: Brad D Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Christine Gealy England
Represented By: Michael James Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?