Dicke v. Canyon County, et al.
Plaintiff: Lynn Dicke
Defendant: Canyon County, Judge Davis Vandervelde, Canyon County Courthouse and Bryan F Taylor
Case Number: 1:2022cv00368
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #21 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (alw)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bryan F Taylor, Canyon County Courthouse re #20 #22 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/12/2022. (alw) Modified on 10/13/2022 to add party (alw).
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Canyon County Courthouse. Canyon County Courthouse waiver sent on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. (Reed, Dayton)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayton Patrick Reed on behalf of Canyon County Courthouse (Reed, Dayton)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Alexis R Klempel appearing for Defendants Canyon County, Bryan F Taylor. Responses due by 11/2/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Klempel, Alexis)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Klempel on behalf of Bryan F Taylor (Klempel, Alexis)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Judge Davis Vandervelde re #18 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/12/2022. (alw)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Dayton Patrick Reed on behalf of Judge Davis Vandervelde (Reed, Dayton)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Judge Davis Vandervelde. Judge Davis Vandervelde waiver sent on 10/3/2022, answer due 12/2/2022. (Reed, Dayton)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Lynn Dicke (Attachments: #1 document, #2 document)(alw)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of a lawsuit and request to waive service of summons by Lynn Dicke (Attachments: #1 notice, #2 notice)(alw)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Canyon County and Canyon County of Idaho. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Canyon county)(jd)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Dicke. Canyon County served on 9/16/2022, answer due 10/7/2022; Judge Davis Vandervelde served on 9/16/2022, answer due 10/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 summons executed)(alw)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Canyon County Courthouse, Bryan F Taylor. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Canyon County Courthouse, Judge Davis Vandervelde, Bryan F Taylor, filed by Lynn Dicke. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(alw)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (alw)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Canyon County, Lynn Dicke re #2 Complaint, #7 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/28/2022. (alw)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Alexis R Klempel appearing for Defendant Canyon County. Responses due by 10/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Klempel, Alexis)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis R Klempel on behalf of Canyon County (Klempel, Alexis)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Dickes Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #1 ) is DENIED as stated herein. Dickes Complaint (Dkt. #2 ) is deficient as it fails to state any claims uponwhich relief can be granted. Her Complaint is therefore DISMISSEDWITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court grants Dicke leave to file an AmendedComplaint in substantial compliance with the Courts analysis above.. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons for Canyon County, Canyon County Courthouse)(jd)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Canyon County, Judge Davis Vandervelde, Canyon County Courthouse, filed by Lynn Dicke. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit)(jd)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: Filing Fee Received $ 402.00, receipt # 30385. (jd)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Canyon County, filed by Lynn Dicke. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit)(ac)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lynn Dicke. Responses due by 9/14/2022 (ac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicke v. Canyon County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Dicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon County
Represented By: Alexis R Klempel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Davis Vandervelde
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon County Courthouse
Represented By: Dayton Patrick Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan F Taylor
Represented By: Alexis R Klempel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?