Witzke v. Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the et al
Plaintiff: Esq. Brooks M Witzke
Defendant: Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, DAG Robert A Berry, AG Lawrence G Wasden, Kristin L Bjorkman, Bar Counsel Joseph N Pirtle, Judge Mitchell W Brown, Caribou County Idaho, Franklin County, Idaho, Bear Lake County and Bannock County
Case Number: 1:2022cv00478
Filed: November 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Sanctions ( Responses due by 2/7/2023), MOTION Reimbursement of Service of Process Costs In Having County Defendants Re-Served With Process Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Witzke, Brooks)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #53 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by Brooks M Witzke, #57 MOTION for Relief Plaintiff's Letter to The Court About Ms. Bjorkman's Affidavit and Request For Sanctions And Request To Court for Guidance on How Court Wants to Proceed filed by Brooks M Witzke, #43 MOTION to Strike Portion of Exhibit "C" To Pirtle Affidavit filed by Brooks M Witzke, #9 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice OF KRISTIN L. BJORKMANS SERVICE-DODGING EXPLOITS AS MANIFESTING BAD FAITH EFFORTS TO IMPOSE DELAY filed by Brooks M Witzke, #19 MOTION Motion for Court To Order Briefing On Issue of Whether Non-Reciprocal Disciplinary Proceedings Should Be Initiated Under Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 83.5(b)(4)(A) filed by Brooks M Witzke, #65 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by Brooks M Witzke. (Witzke, Brooks)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Sealed Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Under General Order No. 351 SEALED MOTION MOTION to Seal Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel Filed Herewith The Motion to Appoint filed by Brooks M Witzke.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Indigence)(Witzke, Brooks)
January 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2023 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr.. On or before Thursday, February 2, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION Motion for Court To Order Briefing On Issue of Whether Non-Reciprocal Disciplinary Proceedings Should Be Initiated Under Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 83.5(b)(4)(A) Plaintiff's Reply Memo In Support of Motion To Order Briefing On Issue of Non-Reciprocal Disciplinary Proceedings and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to "Admonish" Plaintiff for Attorney Misconduct filed by Brooks M Witzke.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2023.(Witzke, Brooks)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr: Status Conference held on 1/12/2023. (ESR jh.) Audio File Location via Zoom. (jh)THESE MINUTES SHALL STAND AS THE ORDER OF THE COURT
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bannock County, Bear Lake County, Caribou County Idaho, Franklin County, Idaho.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2023.(Hall, Blake)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. Defendants Motion to Redact (Dkt. #58 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Seal (Dkt. #18 -1) is GRANTED and Defendants Motion to Seal (Dkt. #40 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Video Status Conference set for 1/12/2023 01:00 PM via Video Zoom before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr. Counsel to receive video link via separate notification. Members of the public may use the following to attend this matter via Audio ONLY: 1-669-254-5252, Meeting ID: 161 353 5346, Meeting Password: 419755. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition under federal law and Local Rule 83.1 against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Please refer to the Courts website for the most recent general order regarding protocols and procedures during the COVID-19 pandemic. (jh)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #58 MOTION Redaction of Personal Information re #1 Complaint,, #19 MOTION Motion for Court To Order Briefing On Issue of Whether Non-Reciprocal Disciplinary Proceedings Should Be Initiated Under Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 83.5(b)(4)(A) Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to State Defendants' Motion to Redact and Explanation by Plaintiff for Why Such Information Was Originally Included filed by Brooks M Witzke. Replies due by 1/19/2023.(Witzke, Brooks)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION Redaction of Personal Information re #1 Complaint,, #19 MOTION Motion for Court To Order Briefing On Issue of Whether Non-Reciprocal Disciplinary Proceedings Should Be Initiated Under Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 83.5(b)(4)(A) Joseph M Aldridge appearing for Defendants Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden. Responses due by 1/26/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum ISO of Motion for Redaction, #2 Affidavit Declaration ISO Memorandum)(Aldridge, Joseph)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Relief Plaintiff's Letter to The Court About Ms. Bjorkman's Affidavit and Request For Sanctions And Request To Court for Guidance on How Court Wants to Proceed Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 1/26/2023 (Witzke, Brooks)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER denying as moot #20 Motion to Appoint Receiver. In light of the Memorandum Decision and Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 50), Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint a Special Master is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Sealed Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Under General Order No. 351 SEALED MOTION MOTION to Seal Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel Filed Herewith The Motion to Appoint filed by Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden. Replies due by 1/17/2023.(Aldridge, Joseph)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION Motion for Court To Order Briefing On Issue of Whether Non-Reciprocal Disciplinary Proceedings Should Be Initiated Under Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 83.5(b)(4)(A) filed by Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden. Replies due by 1/17/2023.(Aldridge, Joseph)
January 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice OF KRISTIN L. BJORKMANS SERVICE-DODGING EXPLOITS AS MANIFESTING BAD FAITH EFFORTS TO IMPOSE DELAY Plaintiff Brooks M. Witzke's Response to Defendant Bjorkman's Opposition for Judicial Notice, Memorandum in Opposition to Ms. Bjorkman's Motion for Sanctions, and Plaintiff's Motion for Counter Sanctions Under FRCP Rule 11 filed by Brooks M Witzke.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1 Witzke Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Exhibit 2 Homolka Affidavit)(Witzke, Brooks)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To The County Defendants' "Motion to Dismiss" filed by Brooks M Witzke. Replies due by 1/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(Witzke, Brooks)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process of Complaint Plaintiff Had County Defendants Re-Served With Service Of Process A Second Time, filed by Brooks M Witzke., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooks M Witzke. (Witzke, Brooks)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #3 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion in Limine (Dkt. #44 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Statement Response to Additional Authority Provided At Oral Argument for Preliminary Injunction By Court Permission filed by Brooks M Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Witzke, Brooks)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2022 re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Brooks M Witzke, #44 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Further Testimony and Evidence And To Deem Certain Facts Conclusively Established and Admitted As A Matter of Law filed by Brooks M Witzke. (ESR jh.) Audio File Location via Zoom. (jh)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice OF KRISTIN L. BJORKMANS SERVICE-DODGING EXPLOITS AS MANIFESTING BAD FAITH EFFORTS TO IMPOSE DELAY filed by Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden. Replies due by 1/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Response)(Aldridge, Joseph)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Further Testimony and Evidence And To Deem Certain Facts Conclusively Established and Admitted As A Matter of Law filed by Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden. Replies due by 1/3/2023.(Aldridge, Joseph)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER setting Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine and to Prohibit Oral Testimony (Dkt. 44). In light of the December 20, 2022, motion hearing, Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine and Motion to Prohibit Oral Testimony (Dkt. 44) is due by December 19, 2022, at 3:30 p.m. Mountain Time. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION in Limine To Prevent Further Testimony and Evidence And To Deem Certain Facts Conclusively Established and Admitted As A Matter of Law Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 1/9/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum In Support of Motion In Limine)(Witzke, Brooks)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Strike Portion of Exhibit "C" To Pirtle Affidavit Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 1/6/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support)(Witzke, Brooks)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Seal , #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Brooks M Witzke.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Exceed Page Limits By Single Page)(Witzke, Brooks)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden. Replies due by 12/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration ISO Opp.)(Aldridge, Joseph)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Seal Joseph M Aldridge appearing for Defendants Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden. Responses due by 1/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo ISO Motion)(Aldridge, Joseph)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING BANNOCK COUNTY. IT HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Defendant Bannock County are hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for Consent Forms (Dkt. #7 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Special Master (Dkt. #10 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs Motion to Expedite (Dkt. #25 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re: 12/20/2022 MOTION HEARING. The County Defendants do not need to respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #3 ). The December 20, 2022, motion hearing is limited to argument on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Bannock County by Bannock County. (Hall, Blake)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DOCKET TEXT AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite : Video Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2022 10:00 AM via Video Zoom before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr. The date and time remain the same - this hearing will be via Zoom and not in-person. The parties will receive the Zoom information via separate notification prior to the hearing.(jh)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #26 MOTION to Dismiss (alw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2022 10:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr. (jh)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 consent, #2 consent)(alw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order The expedited consent deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (alw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge David C. Nye no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:22-cv-478-REP (alw)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:22-cv-478-DCN (alw)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER setting an expedited briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 3). Unless otherwise ordered, Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due December 15, 2022. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due December 16, 2022, at 4:00 p.m. Mountain Time. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Expedited Preliminary Injunction Hearing (D.I. 28) filed by Brooks M Witzke.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/14/2022.(Witzke, Brooks)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Bannock County, Bear Lake County, Caribou County Idaho, Franklin County, Idaho. Replies due by 12/27/2022.(Hall, Blake)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite filed by Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden. Replies due by 12/27/2022.(Aldridge, Joseph)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Blake G Hall appearing for Defendants Bannock County, Bear Lake County, Caribou County Idaho, Franklin County, Idaho. Responses due by 1/3/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hall, Blake)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on (D.I. 10) Motion For Judge Nye to Appoint Judge Patricco as a Special Master In Event Defendants Do Not Provide Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 1/3/2023 (Witzke, Brooks)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re Defendants' Response to #17 Emergency Motion to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing by December 13, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. Mountain Time. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bannock County, Bear Lake County, Caribou County Idaho, Franklin County, Idaho re #21 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/13/2022. (alw)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: EXPEDITED CONSENTS. Court will order an expedited consent deadline of December 13, 2022, at 5:00 p.m. Mountain Time. If not all parties consent by that time, the case will be automatically reassigned to a District Judge on December 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (alw)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Demand for Jury Trial by Bannock County, Bear Lake County, Caribou County Idaho, Franklin County, Idaho.(Hall, Blake)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Motion to Appoint Special Master (FRCP 53) for Purposes of Ensuring Compliance With Court Orders Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 1/3/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Witzke, Brooks)
December 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION Motion for Court To Order Briefing On Issue of Whether Non-Reciprocal Disciplinary Proceedings Should Be Initiated Under Dist. Idaho Loc. Civ. R. 83.5(b)(4)(A) Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 1/3/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Witzke, Brooks) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/10/2023) (alw).
December 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Sealed Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Under General Order No. 351, SEALED MOTION ( Responses due by 1/3/2023), MOTION to Seal Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel Filed Herewith The Motion to Appoint Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Seal Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel)(Witzke, Brooks)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Preliminary Injunction Hearing, MOTION for Hearing re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite ( Responses due by 12/30/2022)Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. (Witzke, Brooks)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (alw)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden, Brooks M Witzke re #1 Complaint,, #13 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/6/2023. (alw)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph N Pirtle, Robert A Berry, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Lawrence G Wasden, Kristin L Bjorkman. Joseph N Pirtle waiver sent on 11/27/2022, answer due 1/26/2023; Robert A Berry waiver sent on 11/27/2022, answer due 1/26/2023; Mitchell W Brown waiver sent on 11/27/2022, answer due 1/26/2023; Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the waiver sent on 11/27/2022, answer due 1/26/2023; Lawrence G Wasden waiver sent on 11/27/2022, answer due 1/26/2023; Kristin L Bjorkman waiver sent on 11/27/2022, answer due 1/26/2023. (Aldridge, Joseph)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Aldridge on behalf of Robert A Berry, Kristin L Bjorkman, Mitchell W Brown, Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the, Joseph N Pirtle, Lawrence G Wasden (Aldridge, Joseph)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Bear Lake County, filed by Brooks M Witzke., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brooks M Witzke , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooks M Witzke. Bear Lake County served on 12/2/2022, answer due 12/23/2022. (Witzke, Brooks)
December 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooks M Witzke. Bannock County served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022; Caribou County Idaho served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022; Franklin County, Idaho served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brooks M Witzke , AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service of Process of Complaint , Exhibits, and Preliminary Injunction Motion and Memorandum in Support served on Counties of Bannock, Caribou, and Franklin on November 28, 2022, filed by Brooks M Witzke. (Witzke, Brooks)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Relief ( Responses due by 12/20/2022), MOTION Motion to Appoint Judge Raymond Patricco as a Special Master To Preside Over Case In Event Defendants Do Not Consent To Magistrate Jurisdiction; Motion to Disqualify Judge Nye For Cause , MOTION to Disqualify Judge Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Appoint Judge Patricco as a Special Master and to Disqualify Judge Nye)(Witzke, Brooks)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice OF KRISTIN L. BJORKMANS SERVICE-DODGING EXPLOITS AS MANIFESTING BAD FAITH EFFORTS TO IMPOSE DELAY Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 12/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Process Server About Bjorkman's Shenanigans)(Witzke, Brooks)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION Confirmation that Notice of Preliminary Injunction Was Provided to Defendants, Notice to Court That a TRO May Be Filed ( Responses due by 12/19/2022), MOTION to Expedite , MOTION to Confirm Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice)(Witzke, Brooks)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION Letter to Docket Clerk Requesting Issuance of Magistrate Consent Form Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 12/14/2022 (Witzke, Brooks)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CM/ECF PRIVILEGES FOR PURPOSES OF THE CAUSE OF ACTION. Plaintiffs Motion for CM/ECF Privileges for Purposes of the Cause of Action (Dkt. #2 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Berry, #2 Summons Wasden, #3 Summons Pirtle, #4 Summons Bjorkman, #5 Summons Brown, #6 Summons Caribou County, #7 Summons Franklin County, #8 Summons Bear Lake County, #9 Summons Bannock County)(alw)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk is directed to reassign this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Raymond E. Patricco. Please use case number 1:22-CV-00478-REP on all future pleadings. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (LT)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:22-cv-478-REP (alw)
November 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Expedite ( Responses due by 12/12/2022)Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Hearing As Soon As Practicable, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Brief In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Witzke, Brooks)
November 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION Motion for E-Filing Privileges for This Cause of Action Only Brooks M. Witzke appearing for Plaintiff Brooks M Witzke. Responses due by 12/12/2022 (Witzke, Brooks)
November 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Brooks M Witzke ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2481981.), filed by Brooks M Witzke. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ISB Summons, #3 Summons Robert Berry Summons, #4 Summons Lawrence Wasden Summons, #5 Summons Joe Pirtle Summons, #6 Summons Kristin Bjorkman Summons, #7 Summons Judge Brown Summons, #8 Summons Caribou County Summons, #9 Summons Franklin County Summons, #10 Summons Bear Lake County Summons, #11 Summons Bannock County Summons, #12 Exhibit Exhibits to Verified Complaint)(Witzke, Brooks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witzke v. Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esq. Brooks M Witzke
Represented By: Brooks M. Witzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idaho State Bar, Board of Commissioners of the
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Represented By: Keegan Charles August Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAG Robert A Berry
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Represented By: Keegan Charles August Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Lawrence G Wasden
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Represented By: Keegan Charles August Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin L Bjorkman
Represented By: Keegan Charles August Hahn
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bar Counsel Joseph N Pirtle
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Represented By: Keegan Charles August Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Mitchell W Brown
Represented By: Keegan Charles August Hahn
Represented By: Joseph M Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribou County Idaho
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County, Idaho
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Lake County
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bannock County
Represented By: Blake G Hall
Represented By: Sam L. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?