Wilke, et al. v. Pacheco, et al.
Plaintiff: Matt Wilke, Thomas Wilke and Jenine Wilke
Defendant: Daniel Pacheco, IPRO Solutions LLC, IPRO Network LLC, IThrive Corporation, IThrive Group, LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2023cv00134
Filed: March 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Matt Wilke. Replies due by 6/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Vaughn Fisher)(Fisher, Vaughn)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Vaughn Fisher appearing for Plaintiffs Jenine Wilke, Matt Wilke, Thomas Wilke. Responses due by 6/9/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Fisher, Vaughn)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ac)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER adopting #21 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Plaintiff must respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by May 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) to Extend Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Matt Wilke. (Fisher, Vaughn)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER adopting #19 Stipulation to Withdraw Application for Entry of Default. Plaintiff's application for entry of default is withdrawn and the Court will make no determination as to the issue. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION to Withdraw Application for Entry of Default by Matt Wilke. (Fisher, Vaughn)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 First MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6). Responses due by 5/12/2023 (ac)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER adopting #17 Stipulation to Extend Response Time. Plaintiffs must respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 15) by 5/12/2023. All other deadlines remain in place unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION re #15 First MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) to Extend Time to file Plaintiffs' Response by Matt Wilke. (Fisher, Vaughn)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by IPRO Network LLC, IPRO Solutions LLC, Daniel Pacheco Response to Application for Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Wellman, Scott)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) Chris Andrew Wellman appearing for Defendants IPRO Network LLC, IPRO Solutions LLC, Daniel Pacheco. Responses due by 5/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in support of motion to dismiss)(Wellman, Chris)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE REAL PARTY IN INTEREST - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: IThrive Group, LLC, a Nevada limited liability corporation is substituted as a defendant in place of IThrive Corporation, a Delaware corporation. Defendants must file an affidavit or declaration, by April 28, 2023, properly alleging the state of citizenship as of the time of removal for each member and owner of Defendant IThrive Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION to Substitute Real Party in Interest by Matt Wilke. (Fisher, Vaughn)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel Pacheco re #8 Order,, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Daniel Pacheco . (Dindinger, Edward)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: IPRO Network LLC answer due 4/14/2023; IPRO Solutions LLC answer due 4/14/2023; Daniel Pacheco answer due 4/14/2023. (jd)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER adopting #10 Stipulation to Extend Response Deadline. Defendants must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by April 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (hsm)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS DANIEL PACHECO, IPRO NETWORK, LLC, AND IPRO SOLUTIONS, LLC TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT: by Daniel Pacheco. (Wellman, Chris)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Edward W. Dindinger re #2 Declaration, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by IPRO Network LLC, IPRO Solutions LLC, IThrive Corporation, Daniel Pacheco . (Dindinger, Edward)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants file an affidavit or declaration, by April 17, 2023, properly alleging the state of citizenship as of the time of removal for each Plaintiff and Defendant Daniel Pacheco, as well as the state of citizenship for each member or owner of Defendants IPro Solutions LLC and IPro Network LLC. Failure to comply with this order may result in the case being remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for IPRO Network LLC, IPRO Solutions LLC, IThrive Corporation, Daniel Pacheco, Jenine Wilke, Matt Wilke, Thomas Wilke Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/2/2023. (ac)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christopher Wellman for IPRO Network LLC,Christopher Wellman for IPRO Solutions LLC,Christopher Wellman for IThrive Corporation,Christopher Wellman for Daniel Pacheco Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac) Modified on 4/3/2023 to reflect "docket entry order" (ac). Modified on 4/3/2023 to correct filing date (km).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Scott Wellman for IPRO Network LLC,Scott Wellman for IPRO Solutions LLC,Scott Wellman for IThrive Corporation,Scott Wellman for Daniel Pacheco Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac) Modified on 4/3/2023 to correct filing date (km).
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - IPRO Network LLC served on 3/31/2023; IPRO Solutions LLC served on 3/31/2023; IThrive Corporation served on 3/31/2023; Daniel Pacheco served on 3/31/2023. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ac) Modified on 4/3/2023 to correct filing date (km).
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Disclosure Statement filed byEdward William Dindinger on behalf of IPRO Network LLC, IPRO Solutions LLC, IThrive Corporation. (Dindinger, Edward)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Scott Wellman. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2546407.)Edward William Dindinger appearing for Defendants IPRO Network LLC, IPRO Solutions LLC, IThrive Corporation, Daniel Pacheco. Responses due by 4/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application)(Dindinger, Edward)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher Wellman. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2546406.)Edward William Dindinger appearing for Defendants IPRO Network LLC, IPRO Solutions LLC, IThrive Corporation, Daniel Pacheco. Responses due by 4/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application)(Dindinger, Edward)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by IThrive Corporation, Daniel Pacheco, IPRO Solutions LLC, IPRO Network LLC. (Dindinger, Edward)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Edward W. Dindinger re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by IPRO Network LLC, IPRO Solutions LLC, IThrive Corporation, Daniel Pacheco . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- State Complaint, #2 Exhibit- State docket sheet & Service Documents)(Dindinger, Edward) Modified on 4/3/2023 to reflect specific exhibit title (ac).
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from District Court of the Fourth Judicial District of the State of Idaho, In and For the County of Ada, case number CV01-22-13982.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2546353.), filed by All Defendants.(Dindinger, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilke, et al. v. Pacheco, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Wilke
Represented By: Christopher F Brown
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wilke
Represented By: Christopher F Brown
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenine Wilke
Represented By: Christopher F Brown
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Pacheco
Represented By: Edward William Dindinger
Represented By: Chris Andrew Wellman
Represented By: Christopher Wellman
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPRO Solutions LLC
Represented By: Edward William Dindinger
Represented By: Chris Andrew Wellman
Represented By: Christopher Wellman
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPRO Network LLC
Represented By: Edward William Dindinger
Represented By: Chris Andrew Wellman
Represented By: Christopher Wellman
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IThrive Corporation
Represented By: Edward William Dindinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IThrive Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Wellman
Represented By: Edward William Dindinger
Represented By: Scott Wellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?