Maley v. Marlar
Plaintiff: Deanna Maley
Defendant: Macquinzi Marlar
Case Number: 1:2023cv00201
Filed: April 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2023 Filing 26 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE VACATING HEARING: The parties have notified the Court they have reached a settlement and are finalizing paperwork. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2023 is VACATED and will be reset for a later date if necessary. (st)
June 22, 2023 Filing 25 DISCOVERY PLAN by Deanna Maley . (Howard, Michael)
June 22, 2023 Filing 24 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Deanna Maley. (Howard, Michael)
June 15, 2023 Filing 23 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (lm)
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Michael Trevor Howard for Deanna Maley added. Attorney Benjamin Paul Cloward terminated. Request to Turn Electronic Noticing OFF (no longer receive NEFs in this case only) by Attorney (Howard, Michael)
May 12, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Macquinzi Marlar (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion to Consolidate)(Adams, Stephen) Modified on 5/15/2023 to edit the docket text(lm).
May 9, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Stephen Lee Adams for Macquinzi Marlar added. Attorney Marissa R Temple terminated. Request to Leave Noticing ON for this case by Attorney (Adams, Stephen)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on June 29, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. On or before June 22, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
April 25, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Deanna Maley, Macquinzi Marlar re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/26/2023. (hs)
April 25, 2023 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:22-cv-01718. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 25, 2023 All out of state counsel continuing representation need to obtain local counsel and file an Application for Pro Hac Vice. Please see Local Rule, Civil Rule 83.4 Bar Admission e) Pro Hac Vice/Local Counsel and ECF Procedures 3. Registration, Logins and Passwords. B. Limited Registered Participants.1. (hs)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, #5 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case to the District of Idaho. Following transfer of the case, the Clerk of Court shall close the case in this district. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (hs).
February 16, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Discovery Hearing held on 2/16/2023 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Benjamin Cloward, Esq.; Def Counsel: Marissa Temple, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 10:30am; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Liberty/CRD; Recording start and end times: 10:32:41 - 10:36:00; Courtroom: 3B; All parties appear via videoconference for these proceedings. The Court scheduled this conference at the request of Counsel after the issuance of it's Minute Order 13 . The Court hears the positions of Counsel regarding discovery and regarding the pending Motion to Change/Transfer Venue #5 . Counsel jointly request a stay of discovery in open court. IT IS ORDERED: Discovery will be STAYED in this matter until the Motion to Change/Transfer Venue #5 is decided. Should that motion be denied, Counsel are directed to file a Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order within 14 days of ruling. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
February 14, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/14/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Jeff Miller.At the request of Counsel, IT IS ORDERED: Hearing re: Minute Order 13 is set for 2/16/2023 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Counsel are permitted to appear via videoconference for these proceedings and shall contact Courtroom Administrator Jeff Miller at jeff_miller@nvd.uscourts.gov to request an invitation. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
February 13, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/13/2023. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is DENIED. The Court does not find good cause for the lengthy discovery period the parties seek. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a new proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 2/17/2023. The parties may seek up to 270 days for discovery from their Rule 26(f) conference. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
February 10, 2023 Filing 12 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Deanna Maley.. (Estrada, Ian) (hs).
February 9, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Ian Estrada on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna Maley. (Estrada, Ian) (hs).
January 25, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/25/2023. The Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is past due in this case. Accordingly, the parties must file a joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 2/9/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EmG)
November 14, 2022 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Deanna Maley.. (Cloward, Benjamin) (hs).
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer by Defendant Macquinzi Marlar. (Temple, Marissa) (hs).
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer by Plaintiff Deanna Maley. Replies due by 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron DeShaw)(Cloward, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2023: #1 Declaration of Aaron DeShaw) (hs).
October 31, 2022 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Macquinzi Marlar.. (Temple, Marissa) (hs).
October 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue or Transfer. Responses due by 11/1/2022. (Temple, Marissa) (hs).
October 12, 2022 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/12/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/27/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (hs).
October 12, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Macquinzi Marlar. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Temple, Marissa) (hs).
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-855063-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7078687) by Macquinzi Marlar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Temple, Marissa) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2023: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hs).
October 12, 2022 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maley v. Marlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Maley
Represented By: Ian Estrada
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Cloward
Represented By: Michael Trevor Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquinzi Marlar
Represented By: Marissa R Temple
Represented By: Stephen Lee Adams
Represented By: Trudy Hanson Fouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?