PayServices Bank v. Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco
Plaintiff: PayServices Bank
Defendant: FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO
Case Number: 1:2023cv00305
Filed: June 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief] Robert A Faucher appearing for Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Responses due by 9/5/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Meredith Karp)(Faucher, Robert)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ac)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco and PayServices Bank re #1 Complaint and #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/29/2023. (km)
July 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: DKTS. #7 , #9 AND #10 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Dkt. 7) is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 14, 2023. Plaintiff's Application to Clerk for Entry of Default (Dkt. 9) is DENIED. Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response in Opposition and Application to Clerk for Entry of Default (Dkt. 10) IS DENIED as moot. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Response in Opposition and Application to Clerk for Entry of Default filed by Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/31/2023.(Faucher, Robert)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jonathan Youngwood and #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Meredith Karp for Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Meredith Karp. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2604827.)Robert A Faucher appearing for Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Responses due by 8/17/2023 (Faucher, Robert)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jonathan Youngwood. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2604808.)Robert A Faucher appearing for Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Responses due by 8/17/2023 (Faucher, Robert)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by PayServices Bank.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/27/2023.(Craig, Jade)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Response in Opposition and Application to Clerk for Entry of Default filed by PayServices Bank. Replies due by 8/9/2023.(Craig, Jade)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco's Opposition to Plaintiff's Application to Clerk for Entry of Default filed by Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Replies due by 8/8/2023.(Faucher, Robert)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Robert A. Faucher in Support of Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco's Motion for Extension of Time)(Faucher, Robert)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Response in Opposition and Application to Clerk for Entry of Default Robert A Faucher appearing for Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Responses due by 8/15/2023 (Faucher, Robert)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Jade A Craig appearing for Plaintiff PayServices Bank. Responses due by 8/15/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Lionel Danenberg)(Craig, Jade)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by PayServices Bank. Replies due by 8/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Law360 Article, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Email)(Craig, Jade) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/24/2023) (ac). Modified on 7/24/2023 replaced exhibit 1 pursuant to request by Attorney Jade Craig (ac).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Robert A Faucher appearing for Defendant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Responses due by 8/14/2023 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Faucher)(Faucher, Robert)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PayServices Bank. Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco served on 7/3/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (ac)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ac)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE re: Corrective Entry-Fees Not Paid. The court has been informed that payment is forthcoming, please disregard the 5 day filing fee due date. (jd)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: Check #284 Fee Received $ 652.00, filing fee 402 and motion for PHV 250 receipt # 31803. (jd) Modified on 7/3/2023 (lm).
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jade Craig for PayServices Bank Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jade A. Craig. Asa Daniel Brown appearing for Plaintiff PayServices Bank. Responses due by 7/19/2023 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Additional Court Admissions)(Brown, Asa)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry document number #1 Complaint filed by PayServices Bank was filed without payment of the required filing fee. The filing party has five (5) days from the date of this notice to pay the fees to the Clerk of Court, or file a motion to waive the filing fee.(ac)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Any attorney seeking Pro Hac Vice admission must have local counsel enter a Motion for PHV on their behalf. Please use the Pro Hac Vice admission form located on the courts webpage. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing.(ac)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO, filed by PayServices Bank. (Attachments: #1 eFile Cover Sheet)(Brown, Asa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PayServices Bank v. Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PayServices Bank
Represented By: Jade Craig
Represented By: Asa Daniel Brown
Represented By: Jade A Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Julie A Hamilton
Represented By: Robert A Faucher
Represented By: A. Dean Bennett
Represented By: Jonathan Youngwood
Represented By: Meredith Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?