Lezamiz v. The Travelers Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Bonnie Lezamiz and John Lezamiz
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers and Travelers Corp.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00339
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Amanda K Brailsford
Referring Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE VACATING Hearing: Pursuant to informal communications with counsel, the telephonic scheduling conference set for September 6, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby VACATED. (kt)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER - Dispositive Motion Deadline: due by 6/28/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 11/29/2023. Mediation shall take place by 6/28/2024. All fact discovery must be completed by May 29, 2024. Plaintiff must disclose the experts intended to be called at trial on or before March 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
August 23, 2023 Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Guadagno, Michael)
August 23, 2023 Filing 12 DISCOVERY PLAN by Travelers Indemnity Company Lezamiz, Bonnie and Lezamiz, John. (Guadagno, Michael)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before August 30, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2023 01:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Amanda K Brailsford. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 21, 2023 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE VACATING HEARING: This case has been reassigned to U.S. District Judge Amanda K. Brailsford; therefore, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2023 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale is VACATED. (st)
August 21, 2023 Filing 9 A REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A DISTRICT JUDGE HAS BEEN FILED IN THIS CASE(jd)
August 21, 2023 Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF HEARING (hearing type changed from Status Conference to Scheduling Conference): Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2023 10:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. The parties shall dial 1-669-254-5252, Meeting ID: 161 6744 7776 to join the conference call. (st)
August 21, 2023 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Amanda K Brailsford for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 1:23-cv-00339-AKB. (jd)
July 28, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Guadagno, Michael)
July 28, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Guadagno, Michael)
July 27, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonnie Lezamiz, John Lezamiz. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beck, Joel)
July 24, 2023 Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2023 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. On or before August 22, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
July 24, 2023 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, Corrective Entry,. (Guadagno, Michael)
July 24, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bonnie Lezamiz, John Lezamiz, Travelers Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/22/2023. (hs)
July 24, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (hs)
July 24, 2023 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, was filed without the Civil Cover Sheet. The filing party shall submit their Civil Cover Sheet using Civil Events/Other Filings/Other Documents/Civil Cover Sheet.(hs)
July 21, 2023 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (hs)
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of the Fifth Judicial District of Idaho, Twin Falls, case number CV42-23-2067.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2602476.) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket, #3 State Court Service Documents)(Guadagno, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lezamiz v. The Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Lezamiz
Represented By: James D Ruchti
Represented By: Joel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lezamiz
Represented By: James D Ruchti
Represented By: Joel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Corp.
Represented By: Michael A Guadagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?