Black, et al. v. IEC Group Inc.
Plaintiff: Miles Black and Melissa Black
Defendant: IEC Group Inc. and IEC Group Inc. doing business as Ameriben
Case Number: 1:2023cv00384
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Amanda K Brailsford
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before November 14, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2023 10:30 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Amanda K Brailsford. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
September 26, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zimmerman, Thomas)
September 25, 2023 Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. for Melissa Black, and for Miles Black. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
September 25, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2634380.)Bonner Charles Walsh appearing for Plaintiffs Melissa Black, Miles Black. Responses due by 10/16/2023 (Walsh, Bonner)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT [DKT 13]- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File Answer to Complaint is GRANTED. Answer due 11/6/2023. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
September 21, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Melissa Black, Miles Black, IEC Group Inc. re. dkt. #1 Complaint, and dkt. #12 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/20/2023. (ac)
September 20, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IEC Group Inc.. (Hancock, Nicole)
September 20, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Nicole C Hancock appearing for Defendant IEC Group Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2023 (Hancock, Nicole)
September 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole C Hancock on behalf of IEC Group Inc. (Hancock, Nicole)
September 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Flick on behalf of Melissa Black, Miles Black (Flick, Brian)
September 5, 2023 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brian D. Flick for Melissa Black, Miles Black. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miles Black, Melissa Black. IEC Group Inc. served on 8/30/2023, answer due 9/20/2023. (Walsh, Bonner)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marita I. Ramirez on behalf of Melissa Black, Miles Black (Ramirez, Marita)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E Dann on behalf of Melissa Black, Miles Black (Dann, Marc)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brian D. Flick. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2623535.)Bonner Charles Walsh appearing for Plaintiffs Melissa Black, Miles Black. Responses due by 9/26/2023 (Walsh, Bonner)
August 28, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to IEC Group Inc. (Print attached Summons for service.) (ac)
August 28, 2023 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #2 and dkt. #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Marc E Dann and Marita I. Ramirez for Melissa Black and for Miles Black. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Marita I. Ramirez. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2620325.)Bonner Charles Walsh appearing for Plaintiffs Melissa Black, Miles Black. Responses due by 9/18/2023 (Walsh, Bonner)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Marc E. Dann. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2620323.)Bonner Charles Walsh appearing for Plaintiffs Melissa Black, Miles Black. Responses due by 9/18/2023 (Walsh, Bonner)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IEC Group Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2619588.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A Notice of Breach Letters)(Walsh, Bonner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black, et al. v. IEC Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Black
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Represented By: Marita I. Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Black
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Represented By: Marita I. Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IEC Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IEC Group Inc. doing business as Ameriben
Represented By: Nicole C Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?