Beebe-Harris v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Plaintiff: Kathy Beebe-Harris
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00052
Filed: January 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Debora K Grasham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Disclosure Statement filed bySarah Nicole O'Keefe on behalf of Amazon.com Services LLC. (O'Keefe, Sarah)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - All dispositive motions, including motions for punitive damages, must be filed by December 13, 2024. Motions to amend pleadings and join parties, except for allegations of punitive damages, must be filed on or before June 13, 2024. ADR must be held by September 13, 2024. All fact discovery must be completed by November 15, 2024. The Court will conduct a status conference with the parties on November 5, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. The telephonic scheduling conference set for March 13, 2024 is VACATED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DISCOVERY PLAN by Amazon.com Services LLC (Joint). (Brown, Justin)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Consent)(lm)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (lm)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kathy Beebe-Harris. Replies due by 3/12/2024.(Street, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (DKt. #10 & #11 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Sarah O'Keefe,Zoe Kathryn Branson for Amazon.com Services LLC Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Z. Katherine Branson. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2709593.)Justin Dutcher Brown appearing for Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. Responses due by 3/14/2024 (Brown, Justin)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Sarah N. O'Keefe. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2709495.)Justin Dutcher Brown appearing for Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. Responses due by 3/14/2024 (Brown, Justin)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Amazon.com Services LLC re #7 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Errata in Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brown, Justin)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: Filing Fee Fee Received $ 405.00, receipt # 100050917 Paid in Full (ch)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Amazon.com Services LLC.(Brown, Justin)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 First Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Justin Dutcher Brown appearing for Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. Responses due by 2/27/2024 (Brown, Justin)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on March 13, 2024, at 9:30 AM. On or before March 6, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC re #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint Attachment 1-State Court Complaint, #2 Summons Attachment 2-State Court Summons and POS, #3 State Court Docket Sheet Attachment 3-State Court Docket Sheet/Register of Actions)(Brown, Justin)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Amazon.com Services LLC, Kathy Beebe-Harris re #1 Notice of Removal Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/1/2024. (lm)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, exhibits were filed incorrectly in this case as they are not properly labeled. Each one should be a separate attachment, and each attachment should be specifically described [i.e. State Court Complaint, State Court Docket, Service Documents] Example: Your Main Document will be the Petition for Removal. State Court documents should be attached as: Attachment 1] Complaint Attachment 2] State Court Docket Attachment 3] Service Documents Attachment 4] Any answers Attachment 5] Pending Motions. The filing party shall re-submit the state court exhibits ONLY using the ECF event supplement.(lm)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Amazon.com Services LLC served on 1/31/2024. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (lm)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Amazon.com Services LLC to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court (Brown, Justin)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Brown, Justin)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon.com Services LLC from 4th Judicial District, Ada County, case number CV01-23-17415., filed by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Cover Sheet)(Brown, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beebe-Harris v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Beebe-Harris
Represented By: Evan S Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Justin Dutcher Brown
Represented By: Sarah Nicole O'Keefe
Represented By: Zoe Kathryn Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?