Sharp v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Jerold Sharp
Defendant: Comm. of Soc. Sec. Martin O'Malley
Case Number: 1:2024cv00145
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Raymond Edward Patricco
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Administrative Record by Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Martin O'Malley. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12)(Becia, Franco)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(ac)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving dkt. #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Andrew Reichardt for Jerold Sharp. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrew Reichardt. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2734460.)Kimberly L Stevens appearing for Plaintiff Jerold Sharp. Responses due by 4/30/2024 (Stevens, Kimberly)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Franco Luciano Becia appearing for Commissioner of Social Security by Attorney (Becia, Franco)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter L Wucetich appearing for Commissioner of Social Security by Attorney (Wucetich, Peter)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security filed by Jerold Sharp. (Stevens, Kimberly)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Martin O'Malley, Jerold Sharp re. dkt. #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/10/2024. (ac)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE - Notice of Filing of Complaint seeking review under 42 U.S.C. 405(g)- re. #1 Complaint for Review of Social Security. Caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Jerold Sharp was filed incorrectly in this case. The Civil Cover Sheet was not completed. The filing party shall re-submit their Civil Cover Sheet, only, using the Civil Cover Sheet event located under Civil Events/Other Filings/Other Documents.(ac)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Statement of Social Security Number by Jerold Sharp This is a sealed document.. (Stevens, Kimberly)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2722344.), filed by Jerold Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Stevens, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerold Sharp
Represented By: Kimberly L Stevens
Represented By: Andrew Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm. of Soc. Sec. Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Represented By: Peter L Wucetich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?