Signatours Corporation v. Callender
Plaintiff: Signatours Corporation
Defendant: Wayne Callender
Case Number: 1:2024cv00151
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Amanda K Brailsford
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER - The telephonic scheduling conference set for May 8, 2024 is VACATED. All dispositive motions and motions for punitive damages, must be filed by January 21, 2025. Motions to amend the pleadings, except for allegations of punitive damages, and motions to join parties must be filed on or before June 7, 2024. All fact discovery must be completed by December 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
May 1, 2024 Filing 14 DISCOVERY PLAN by Signatours Corporation . (Bitar, Brittany)
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Signatours Corporation. (Bitar, Brittany)
May 1, 2024 Filing 12 Plaintiff Signatours Corporation's ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Answer by Signatours Corporation.(Bitar, Brittany)
April 11, 2024 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Service re #1 Complaint, filed by Signatours Corporation . (Bitar, Brittany)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER / CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on May 8, 2024, at 10:15 a.m. mountain time (Boise chambers), for purposes of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before May 1, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
April 11, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Wayne Callender, Signatours Corporation re #1 Complaint, #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/10/2024. (lm)
April 10, 2024 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Wayne Callender. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HomeAway screenshot, #2 Exhibit B - Tineye screenshot)(Bateman, Randall)
March 22, 2024 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Signatours Corporation re Corrective Entry,, Complaint Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(Wieland, Steven)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry. (Wieland, Steven)
March 22, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wayne Callender. (Print attached Summons for service.) (lm)
March 22, 2024 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving (Dkt. #3 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Brittany S. Bitar for Signatours Corporation. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
March 22, 2024 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 - 1 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Signatours Corporation was filed incorrectly in this case. Please re file a signed Civil Cover Sheet.(lm)
March 22, 2024 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Complaint, filed by Signatours Corporation was filed with exhibits attached to the main document. The complaint is your "Main Document" and any supporting documents or exhibits need to be attached to that as "attachments" and properly labeled. DO NOT upload documents to ECF without first ensuring your exhibits are clearly marked and page number references are easily located. The filing party shall re-submit their complaint as the main document with separately attached exhibits using the ECF event "Supplement".(lm)
March 21, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Brittany S. Bitar. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2724833.)Steven P Wieland appearing for Plaintiff Signatours Corporation. Responses due by 4/11/2024 (Wieland, Steven)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Signatours Corporation. (Wieland, Steven)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Copyright Infringement against Wayne Callender ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2724813.), filed by Signatours Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Information Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Wieland, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signatours Corporation v. Callender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signatours Corporation
Represented By: Steven P Wieland
Represented By: Brittany S. Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Callender
Represented By: Randall B Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?