Cayne et al v. Washington Trust Bank et al

Plaintiff: Robert Cayne, Phyllis Cayne, David T Kuo, Bess Lee Chang, Ronnie Rivera, Sean Rivera, Ken McElroy and Laura McElroy
Defendant: Washington Trust Bank, West Sprague Avenue Holdings, LLC and John/Jane Doe I-V
Case Number: 2:2012cv00584
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Kootenai - Northern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 514 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER SETTING AMOUNT OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES (DKT. 392 ) - Based on the foregoing, and consistent with the Courts prior Memorandum Decision and Order Re: Defendants Motion for Attorney Fees and Petition for Costs (Dkt. [492 ]) granting in part and denying in part Defendants Motion for Attorney Fees and Petition for Costs (Dkt. 392 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants are awarded the sum of $1,652,890.72 in attorney fees against Plaintiffs Robert Cayne, Ronnie Rivera, Sean Rivera, and Ken McElroy. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND PETITION FOR COSTS (DKT. 392 ) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Attorney Fees and Petition for Costs (Dkt. 392 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as to the issue of entitlement. A subsequent decision and order will follow, setting the amount of the award, with judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS RULE 50 AND RULE 59 MOTIONS -The Court has carefully considered all of the argument advanced by both sides and the relevant portions of the underlying record. In the exercise of the Courts discretion and co nsistent with the applicable law, the Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,20 or in the alternative, Motion for New Trial (Dkt. 415 ) isDENIED, for the reasons described herein. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
February 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 202 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 246 Motion in Limine; denying 248 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ljo)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON QUANTUM OF PROOF ISSUES re 277 Memorandum/Brief; 278 Memorandum/Brief. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
December 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MEMORANDUM DECISION DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 178) and DENYING Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 211). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ljo)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 125 Plaintiffs Motion to Include a Prayer for Relief Seeking Punitive Damages; granting in part and denying in part 136 Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Proposed Expert Christine Kosydar; d enying 149 Plaintiffs Application for Automatic Exclusion, or to Strike, the Untimely Disclosure of Defendants Experts; granting in part and denying in part 188 Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 7 Seeking Exclusion of Any Evidence or Testimony Conc erning Defendants Proposed Non-Retained Rebuttal Expert Witnesses; granting in part and denying in part 192 Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 9 Seeking the Exclusion of Any Testimony by Peter Stanton; granting 231 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 174 Memorandum Decision and Order re 89 , 99 . This only amends footnote 40 on page 38 to add the word "not" in the second line. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 89 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 99 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cayne et al v. Washington Trust Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cayne
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Cayne
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David T Kuo
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bess Lee Chang
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Rivera
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Rivera
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken McElroy
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura McElroy
Represented By: Douglas S Marfice
Represented By: Adam H Springel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Trust Bank
Represented By: Thomas Timbridge Bassett
Represented By: Thaddeus James O'Sullivan
Represented By: Joseph Todd Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Sprague Avenue Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Timbridge Bassett
Represented By: Thaddeus James O'Sullivan
Represented By: Joseph Todd Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?