Morris et al v. West Hayden Estates First Addition Homeowners Association, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeremy R Morris and Kristy L Morris
Defendant: West Hayden Estates First Addition Homeowners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00018
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Kootenai - Northern
Presiding Judge: Ronald E. Bush
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER The Homeowners Association's Motion for Judgement as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) is GRANTED. In the alternative, the Homeowner's Association is GRANTED a new trial pursuant to Rule 59. Further in t he alternative, the Court ORDERS remittitur. Plaintiffs will accept compensatory and punitive damages in the combined amount of $4.00. Plaintiffs may alternatively elect to proceed to a new trial. The Homeowners Association's Motion to Str ike Affidavits of Jeremy Morris, Lorilee Anne Addy, and Russell Deming (Dkt. 115 ) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief in the Form of De-Annexation from the West Hayden Estates Homeowners Association (Dkt. 107 ) is DENIED. Pla intiffs are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from hosting a Christmas program in the West Hayden Estates that violates the CC&Rs in the manner described in this decision. Pursuant to Declaration Section 8.1, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to pay the Homeowners Associati ons attorney's fees stemming solely from the prosecution of the Homeowner Associations counterclaim. The Homeowner Association's counsel shall submit a petition for fees and costs within 10 days from the date of this decision. Plaintiffs� 39; shall have 5 days thereafter to file any objections to the reasonableness of the costs and fees sought, and the Homeowners Association's counsel shall have 5 additional days to file a reply to any such objections. The Court will then issue an order setting the amount of fees and costs awarded. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. Counsel shall confer and attempt to reach a stipulation to the admission of as many exhibits as possible and submit a Joint Exhibit List by 10/10/2018. (Motions in Limine due by 10/15/2018. Jury Trial set for 10/22/2018 01:30 PM in Coeur d Alene - District Courtroom before Judge B. Lynn Winmill.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 5 ) is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs Idaho Human Rights Act claim. The claim is dismissed without prejudice. 2. Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 5 ) is DENIED as to Plaintiffs Fair Housing Act claims. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. West Hayden Estates First Addition Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy R Morris
Represented By: Jeremy Ray Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy L Morris
Represented By: Jeremy Ray Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Hayden Estates First Addition Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Brindee L Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?