Newman et al v. Depuy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ariel Newman and Tiras Newman
Defendant: North Idaho Day Surgery, LLC, John Does 1-5, NSH North Idaho, Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., ABC Corporations 1-5, Depuy, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. and North Idaho Day Surgery, LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Northwest Specialty Hospital
Case Number: 2:2017cv00168
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Kootenai - Northern
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Referring Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Currently pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice. #10 . Pursuant to the parties' stipulation and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all claims asserted in the above-entitled matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
October 9, 2017 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Elijah Martin Watkins appearing for Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy, Inc.. Responses due by 10/30/2017 (Watkins, Elijah)
June 20, 2017 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (st)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2017, is VACATED. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 8/21/2017. Fact Discovery due by 1/16/2018. Settlement Conference shall be held by 9/28/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2018. All non-dispositive matters are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ronald E. Bush. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
June 16, 2017 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy, Inc.. (Watkins, Elijah)
April 24, 2017 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Joseph G Eaton for DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 6/16/2017 for joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2017 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
April 21, 2017 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy, Inc.. (Watkins, Elijah)
April 21, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Joseph G. Eaton. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-1577299.)Elijah Martin Watkins appearing for Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy, Inc.. Responses due by 5/12/2017 (Watkins, Elijah)
April 18, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy, Inc., Ariel Newman, Tiras Newman re #1 Notice of Removal,, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/19/2017. (cjs)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(b)(5)(iii), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another magistrate judge or to a district judge.Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)
April 18, 2017 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Lodge for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:17-cv-00168-EJL. (cjs)
April 18, 2017 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. served on 4/17/2017; DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. served on 4/17/2017; Depuy, Inc. served on 4/17/2017. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (cjs)
April 18, 2017 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
April 17, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. from Kootenai County District Court, case number CV-2017-0000974.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1574553.), filed by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Elijah M. Watkins, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J - Part 1, #13 Exhibit J - Part 2, #14 Exhibit J - Part 3, #15 Exhibit J - Part 4, #16 Exhibit J - Part 5, #17 Exhibit J - Part 6)(Watkins, Elijah) Modified on 4/18/2017 to edit text for attachments (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman et al v. Depuy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Idaho Day Surgery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSH North Idaho, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Joseph G Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy, Inc.
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Joseph G Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Elijah Martin Watkins
Represented By: Joseph G Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Idaho Day Surgery, LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Northwest Specialty Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Newman
Represented By: John L Runft
Represented By: Jon M Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiras Newman
Represented By: John L Runft
Represented By: Jon M Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?