Zuffa, LLC v. Hansen

Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Defendant: Gwendolyn Hansen, Linked Techology LLC, Haley Kumar and Selva Kumar
Case Number: 2:2018cv00338
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption and Dismiss, Gwendolyn Hansen, ONLY Julie Cohen Lonstein appearing for Plaintiff Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 10/12/2018 (Lonstein, Julie)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Haley Kumar, Selva Kumar, and Linked Techology LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Linked Technology LLC summons, #2 Linked Technology LLC summons, #3 Selva Kumar summons)(st)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gwendolyn Hansen, filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advertisement, #2 Exhibit A-1 Advertisement, #3 Summons Defendant Selva Kumar, #4 Summons Defendant Haley Kumar, #5 Summons Defendant Linked Technology LLC - RA, #6 Summons Defendant Linked Technology LLC - Establishment Address)(Lonstein, Julie)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing of an action (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 complaint) (st)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein for Zuffa, LLC. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Zuffa, LLC REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT (Hart, Trevor)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 ERRATA by Plaintiff Zuffa, LLC re #3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Julie Cohen Lonstein. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1766560.) . (Hart, Trevor)
August 1, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket number #3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Julie Cohen Lonstein. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1766560.) filed by Zuffa, LLC is missing local counsel's signature. The filing party shall re-submit the application using the event "Errata" and link to docket #3 so the fee is not applied again.(st)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gwendolyn Hansen. (Print attached Summons for service.) (st)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to the Northern Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 2:18-cv-00338-DNC for all future filings. (st)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Julie Cohen Lonstein. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1766560.)Trevor L Hart appearing for Plaintiff Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 8/17/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Goodstanding, #2 Exhibit Admission List)(Hart, Trevor)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zuffa, LLC. (Hart, Trevor)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zuffa, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1766554.), filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Hart, Trevor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuffa, LLC v. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Represented By: Trevor L Hart
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linked Techology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selva Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?