Evans v. Sunshine Minting, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rylie Evans
Defendant: Sunshine Minting, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00359
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Office: CDA - Northern Office
County: Kootenai - Northern
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rylie Evans re #13 Amended Complaint (Weiss, Jillian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rylie Evans re #12 Notice of Appearance of Jillian T. Weiss (Weiss, Jillian)
October 5, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #12 Notice of Appearance #13 Amended Complaint filed by Rylie Evans was filed incorrectly in this case as it pertains to the Certificate of Service only. The filing party shall refer to ECF Procedure 8 and re-submit their correct certificate of service using Certificate of Service located under Service of Process and link to the docket entry.(cjs)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 10/29/2018 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2018 11:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sunshine Minting, Inc., filed by Rylie Evans.(Weiss, Jillian)
October 1, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian T Weiss on behalf of Rylie Evans (Weiss, Jillian)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Rylie Evans and Sunshine Minting, Inc. re #1 Complaint and #7 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/27/2018. (st)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Amy M Mensik for Sunshine Minting, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Amy M Mensik. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1791840.)William M Symmes appearing for Defendant Sunshine Minting, Inc.. Responses due by 10/18/2018 (Symmes, William)
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunshine Minting, Inc.. (Symmes, William)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William M Symmes on behalf of Sunshine Minting, Inc. (Symmes, William)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rylie Evans. Sunshine Minting, Inc. served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Birch, Erika)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jillian T Weiss for Rylie Evans. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jillian T. Weiss. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1785242.)Erika Birch appearing for Plaintiff Rylie Evans. Responses due by 10/3/2018 (Birch, Erika)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Birch on behalf of Rylie Evans (Birch, Erika)
August 15, 2018 RECEIPT: Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 22774 (st)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sunshine Minting, Inc. (Original issued summons given to Plaintiff for service.) (st)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sunshine Minting, Inc., filed by Rylie Evans. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Sunshine Minting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rylie Evans
Represented By: Jillian T Weiss
Represented By: Erika Birch
Represented By: Kathryn Kristin Harstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Minting, Inc.
Represented By: William M Symmes
Represented By: Amy M Mensik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?