Loomis v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: JAMES WONG and Carrie Loomis
Defendant: JENNIFER GRAHAM, United States of America Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service, John and Jane Does 1-99 and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00399
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Idaho District Court
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:6212
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2018 9 This case has been closed per the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (st)
September 19, 2018 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carrie Loomis (Bistline, Arthur)
September 19, 2018 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Arthur M Bistline appearing for Plaintiff Carrie Loomis. Responses due by 10/10/2018 (Bistline, Arthur)
September 14, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Graham, United States of America, and James Wong. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 James Wong summons, #2 Jennifer Graham summons)(st)
September 14, 2018 5 Civil Cover Sheet re Corrective Entry,. (Bistline, Arthur)
September 14, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket number #1 Complaint filed by Carrie Loomis should have a civil cover sheet attached. The filing party shall file their cover sheet using the event Civil Cover Sheet located under civil events, other filings, other documents. (st)
September 13, 2018 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 Expedited MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Carrie Loomis.(Bistline, Arthur)
September 13, 2018 3 Declaration in Support by Arthur M. Bistline re #2 Expedited MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Carrie Loomis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bistline, Arthur) Modified on 9/14/2018 to modify document title in the docket text to reflect that it is a declaration (st).
September 13, 2018 2 Expedited MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Arthur M Bistline appearing for Plaintiff Carrie Loomis. Responses due by 10/4/2018 (Bistline, Arthur)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against JENNIFER GRAHAM, United States of America Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service, JAMES WONG ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1785719.), filed by Carrie Loomis.(Bistline, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loomis v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of the Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Loomis
Represented By: Arthur M Bistline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?