Morozko v. Shoshone County Sheriff's Office et al
Petitioner: Kurt A Morozko
Respondent: Shoshone County Sheriff's Office and Mike Gunderson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00426
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:18-cv-426-DCN (jp)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #4 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee when and as he can afford to do so. Within 28 days after entry of this Order, Petitioner may file a second supplement to his Petition setting forth the reasons why Petitioner believes that his Petition is not subject to dismissal. This case shall be REASSIGNED to a United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Petitioner Kurt A Morozko re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (km)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (km)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kurt A Morozko. (km)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Prisoner APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Kurt A Morozko. Responses due by 11/1/2018 (km)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Kurt A Morozko re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/3/2018. (jp)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Kurt A Morozko.(jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morozko v. Shoshone County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kurt A Morozko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shoshone County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?