Ahlwardt v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Ahlwardt
Defendant: Joubert Productions, S.A.S. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00453
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Joubert Productions, S.A.S. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Burke, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY WITHIN THE FIRM re #5 Notice of Substitution. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 6, 2018 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry document number #5 Notice of Substitution in regards to the proposed order, was filed incorrectly in this case. Pursuant to the ECF Procedures, section 12B, all proposed orders are to be submitted by email only to the appropriate Judges proposed order email.(cjs)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney David Christian Clukey for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC added. Attorney Delian Petrov Deltchev terminated. (Attachments: #1 Order for Substitution of Attorney Within the Firm)(Clukey, David)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC of Unavailability (Deltchev, Delian)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Samuel Ahlwardt, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/17/2018. (cjs)
October 18, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 10/17/2018. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (cjs)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.. (Deltchev, Delian)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Kootenai, case number CV28-18-7341.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1800011.), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C- Summons, #5 Exhibit D - Register of Actions)(Deltchev, Delian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahlwardt v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Ahlwardt
Represented By: Patrick K Fannin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joubert Productions, S.A.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Delian Petrov Deltchev
Represented By: David Christian Clukey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?