Dopp v. Gunderson

Petitioner: Sidney David Dopp
Respondent: Mike Gunderson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00480
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
0 Judge: Candy W Dale
1 Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 FIRST RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Sidney David Dopp, Shoshone County Jail, 717 Bank St, Wallace, ID 83873 re #6 Initial Review Order. (cjs)
November 20, 2018 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. Case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Candy W. Dale no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 2:18-cv-00480-DCN. (cjs)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Within 28 days after entry of this Order, Petitioner may file a supplement to his Petition, setting forth the reasons why Petitioner believes that his Petition is not subject to dismissal for non-exhaustion. If Petitioner does not file a supplement, or if the supplement does not plausibly allege special circumstances sufficient to warrant a pretrial writ, this case may be dismissed without further notice. 2. The Clerk of Court will forward Plaintiff a copy of the Courts form civil rights complaint. 3. Because not all named parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73, this case is REASSIGNED to a United States District Judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to Sidney David Dopp re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/31/2018. (jp)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. by Sidney David Dopp. (jp)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Sidney David Dopp.(jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dopp v. Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sidney David Dopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Gunderson
Represented By: L LaMont Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?