Buck Knives, Inc. v. Modern Outdoors LLC

Plaintiff: Buck Knives, Inc.
Defendant: Modern Outdoors LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00511
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Lodge
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case ( Responses due by 2/6/2019)Scott David Swanson appearing for Defendant Modern Outdoors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Swanson, Scott)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Extending Deadline for Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan and Continuing Scheduling Conference granting #11 MOTION filed by Buck Knives, Inc. Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due by 2/15/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset for 2/22/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan, MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference ( Responses due by 2/4/2019)Christopher G. Varallo appearing for Plaintiff Buck Knives, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Varallo, Christopher)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Buck Knives, Inc. as to Modern Outdoors LLC. (Varallo, Christopher)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint . Modern Outdoors LLC answer due 1/16/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Scott David Swanson appearing for Defendant Modern Outdoors LLC. Responses due by 1/18/2019 (Swanson, Scott)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Matthew W Daley for Buck Knives, Inc. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1814394.)Christopher G. Varallo appearing for Plaintiff Buck Knives, Inc.. Responses due by 12/11/2018 (Varallo, Christopher) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/4/2018 to prevent changes to pdf document) (cjs).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. On or before 1/16/2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2019 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s)See attached complaint (Notice sent to USPTO) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (alw) Modified on 11/19/2018 (alw).
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Modern Outdoors LLC, d/b/a BucknBear, Inc. and BucknBear Knives. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buck Knives, Inc.. (Varallo, Christopher)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Modern Outdoors LLC, d/b/a BucknBear, Inc. and BucknBear Knives ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1813130.), filed by Buck Knives, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Varallo, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck Knives, Inc. v. Modern Outdoors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buck Knives, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Represented By: Matthew W Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Outdoors LLC
Represented By: Scott David Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?