Storro v. ClickIt RV LLC et al

Plaintiff: Paul A Storro
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc. and ClickIt RV LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00526
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due by 3/20/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2019 11:00 AM in Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (alw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Thor Motor Coach Inc.. (Harris, Annie)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ClickIt RV LLC. (Harris, Annie)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach Inc... (Harris, Annie)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ClickIt RV LLC. (Harris, Annie)
November 27, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/26/2019. (alw)
November 21, 2018 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (alw)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Bonner County District Court, case number CV09-18-1588.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1815058.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Annie N Harris, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 State Court Docket Information, #7 State Court Complaint, #8 State Court Summons, #9 State Court Affidavit of Service, #10 State Court Declaration of Service, #11 Notice of Filing)(Harris, Annie) Modified on 11/27/2018 (alw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storro v. ClickIt RV LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc.
Represented By: Marc A Lyons
Represented By: Annie Nicklay Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClickIt RV LLC
Represented By: Marc A Lyons
Represented By: Annie Nicklay Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A Storro
Represented By: John Alvan Finney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?