Monroe v. LVNV Funding, LLC
Plaintiff: Simon M Monroe
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00013
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for LVNV Funding, LLC, Simon M Monroe re #3 Answer to Complaint, #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/15/2019. (cjs)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LVNV Funding LLC for LVNV Funding, LLC.. (Smith, Bryan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LVNV Funding, LLC.(Smith, Bryan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LVNV Funding, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (cjs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1833152.), filed by Simon M Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Cover Sheet)(Ballard, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. LVNV Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Bryan D Smith
Represented By: Jon Bonnesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon M Monroe
Represented By: Ryan Adam Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?