Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc v. Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Advanced Lifeline, Inc, Anvanced Lifeline Respiratory Services, DBA and Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc
Defendant: Lacrosse Health & Rehabilitation Center, DBA, Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC and Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00094
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Referring Judge: Robert H Whaley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. (Motion to Amend Pleadings due by 9/30/2019. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Exhibit and Witness Lists due by 6/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 09:00 AM in Coeur d Alene - District Courtroom before Judge Robert H. Whaley. In-Person Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2020 11:00 AM in Coeur d Alene - District Courtroom before Judge Robert H. Whaley.). Signed by Judge Robert H. Whaley. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert H. Whaley: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/2/2019. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Mark Snover.) Time in court: 15 minutes. (st)
July 2, 2019 The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (alw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc. (Hawes, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 DISCOVERY PLAN by Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc . (Hawes, Andrew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Joint Status Report by Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc. (Hawes, Andrew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Sarah Reddick for Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Benjamin C Fultz for Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Sarah Reddick. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1892930.)Andrew E Hawes appearing for Plaintiff Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc. Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Hawes, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Benjamin C. Fultz. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1892913.)Andrew E Hawes appearing for Plaintiff Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc. Responses due by 6/14/2019 (Hawes, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC, Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC. (Fisher, Vaughn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 14 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Mayer S Klein for Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC,Mayer S Klein for Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Mayer S. Klein. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1890404.)Vaughn Fisher appearing for Defendants Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC, Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC. Responses due by 6/10/2019 (Fisher, Vaughn)
May 14, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management deadline set for 6/21/2019. (Per Notice of Hearing, docket #12)(st)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Robert H. Whaley. (st)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC, Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC.(Fisher, Vaughn)
April 30, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjs)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc, Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC, Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC re #1 Complaint, #6 Notice of Appearance Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/1/2019. (cjs)
April 24, 2019 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Robert H Whaley. Please use case number 2:19-cv-00094-RHW on all future pleadings. (st)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case has been reassigned to Judge Robert H Whaley from the Eastern District of Washington for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to the stipulation filed in this case (Dkt. #7 ), the same is hereby approved. Defendant Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene shall answer or otherwise respond by May 20, 2019, and Defendant Cornerstone Healthcare Services shall answer or otherwise respond by May 13, 2019. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (bb)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline by Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC, Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC. (Fisher, Vaughn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vaughn Fisher on behalf of All Defendants (Fisher, Vaughn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc. Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hawes, Andrew) Modified on 4/30/2019 (cjs).
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc. Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hawes, Andrew) Modified on 4/30/2019 (cjs).
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC, Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC)(cjs)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc. (Hawes, Andrew) Modified on 3/26/2019 (cjs).
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC, Lacrosse Health & Rehabilitation Center, DBA, Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1862983.), filed by Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Lacrosse Health, #3 Summons Cornerstone Healthcare)(Hawes, Andrew) Modified on 3/26/2019 to edit text (cjs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc v. Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacrosse Health & Rehabilitation Center, DBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Healthcare Services, LLC
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Mayer S Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacrosse Health-Coeur D'Alene, LLC
Represented By: Vaughn Fisher
Represented By: Mayer S Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Lifeline, Inc
Represented By: Andrew E Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anvanced Lifeline Respiratory Services, DBA
Represented By: Andrew E Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Lifeline Services, Inc
Represented By: Andrew E Hawes
Represented By: Benjamin C Fultz
Represented By: Sarah D Reddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?