Topsy Turvy Ranch, LLC v. M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Topsy Turvy Ranch, LLC
Defendant: M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00218
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan set for 9/2/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 11:00 AM in Pocatello Chambers before Judge David C. Nye. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc..(Blewett, Ronald)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc., Topsy Turvy Ranch, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/19/2019. (jp)
June 17, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc. served on 6/17/2019. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jp)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc.. (Blewett, Ronald)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc. from Benewah County District Court, case number CV05-19-0185.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1901112.), filed by M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summons, #3 State Court Service Documents, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet)(Blewett, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Topsy Turvy Ranch, LLC v. M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. DeAtley Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan D Hally
Represented By: Ronald T Blewett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Topsy Turvy Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P Doman
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?