Hunter v. Two Unknown Named Kootenai County Deputy Sheriffs et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hunter
Defendant: Walmart, Inc., Two Unknown Named Kootenai County Deputy Sheriffs, Kootenai County Sheriff, Deputy Odegnko and Deputy Hoan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00233
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT - NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that Judgment be entered in favor of Defendants and that this case be DISMISSED IN ITS ENTIRETY without prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. #5 ) be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim. 2. IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERED that based on the dismissal of the Amended Complaint, the Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Docket No. #1 ) shall be DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #3 ) will likewise be DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Michael Hunter re: #4 Order of Conditional Filing (alw)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants, filed by Michael Hunter. #1 Envelope #2 Memorandum in Support (jd)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Conditional Filing - (alw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Michael Hunter. Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(alw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(alw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Hunter. Responses due by 7/12/2019 (alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Two Unknown Named Kootenai County Deputy Sheriffs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Unknown Named Kootenai County Deputy Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Odegnko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Hoan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?