Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: The Lands Council, Defenders of Wildlife and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and David Bernhardt
Case Number: 2:2019cv00265
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Lands Council, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Santarsiere, Andrea)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 02:30 PM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before October 8, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons US Fish and Wildlife, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons US Attorney)(alw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, The Lands Council. (Santarsiere, Andrea)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1910947.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to defendant David Bernhardt, #3 Summons Summons to defendant U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, #4 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney for Idaho)(Santarsiere, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lands Council
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Santarsiere
Represented By: Lauren M Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Santarsiere
Represented By: Lauren M Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Santarsiere
Represented By: Lauren M Rule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?