Read v. Bonner County Idaho
Plaintiff: Brandy Read
Defendant: Bonner County Idaho
Case Number: 2:2019cv00285
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on OCTOBER 2, 2019, at 9:30 AM Pacific/10:30 AM Mountain time. On or before SEPTEMBER 24, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (alw)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/30/2019. (ckh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by Defendant Bonner County Idaho re #2 Errata,, State Court Civil Docket. (Yakely, Heather)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA by Defendant Bonner County Idaho re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Appearance of Association of Co-Counsel, #4 Summons Summons Issued from State Court, #5 Exhibit Order of Voluntary Disqualification from State Court, #6 Exhibit Order of Reassignment -Adminstrative from State Court, #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Service from State Court, #8 Exhibit Notice of Unavailability of Counsel from State Court, #9 Exhibit Notice of Appearance for Defendants, #10 Exhibit Notice of Filing Removal)(Yakely, Heather)
July 23, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bonner County Idaho was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall file the missing state court documents and Register of Action as addendum to the Notice of Removal.(alw)
July 22, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (ckh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Bonner County District Court, case number CV09-19-0752.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1915746.), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Appearance for Defendants filed in State Court)(Yakely, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Read v. Bonner County Idaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Read
Represented By: Wendy Jordan Earle
Represented By: Robin Lynn Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonner County Idaho
Represented By: Heather C Yakely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?