Thompson v. Community Connections Incorporated
Plaintiff: Dorinda J Thompson
Defendant: Community Connections Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv00300
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Referring Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Dorinda J Thompson. Replies due by 10/3/2019.(Smith, Kammi)
September 3, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/12/2019 09:30 AM MT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 10/10/2019 10:30 AM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. See Dkt. 10. (at)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dorinda J Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Service)(Smith, Kammi)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. 9). The Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for September 12, 2019 is VACATED AND RESET for October 10, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (MST), in Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale for the purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan and discussing the pending Motion to Change Venue. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans shall be filed on or before October 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lat)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Extension of Deadlines Set Forth in Litigation Order Dated August 8, 2019 Kammi M. Smith appearing for Plaintiff Dorinda J Thompson. Responses due by 9/12/2019 (Smith, Kammi)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/9/2019 03:00 PM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 9/12/2019 09:30 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 9/5/2019. (at)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference onSeptember 9, 2019, at 3:00 PM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before September 3, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the jointLitigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Community Connections Incorporated.(Charney, Dennis)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Community Connections Incorporated. (Charney, Dennis)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jp)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Community Connections Incorporated, Dorinda J Thompson re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/4/2019. (jp)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue Dennis M Charney appearing for Defendant Community Connections Incorporated. Responses due by 8/23/2019 (Charney, Dennis)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Community Connections Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice, #4 Exhibit Contract)(Charney, Dennis)
August 2, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Community Connections Incorporated was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal and labeled the document name. Please refile the Notice of Removal as a supplement and attach the state court documents as exhibits. The filing party shall re-submit their correct filing.(jd)
August 2, 2019 Division Change - reassigned from Southern to Northern. Please use case no. 2:19-cv-00300-CWD. Chambers notified of reassignment. (jd)
August 1, 2019 RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Community Connections Incorporated served on 8/1/2019. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Community Connections Incorporated from District Court of the First Judicial District of the State of Idaho, County of Kootenai, case number CV28-19-3531.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-1920439.), filed by Community Connections Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Charney, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Community Connections Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorinda J Thompson
Represented By: Kammi Mencke Smith
Represented By: Kammi M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Connections Incorporated
Represented By: Dennis M Charney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?