Wilkins-Smithson et al v. City of Coeur d'Alene et al
Plaintiff: Rosalie Caswell-Smithson and Jacob Wilkins-Smithson
Defendant: Jacob Nielsen, Alley Ukich, Chief Lee White, Jane Doe Bangs, City of Coeur d'Alene, Donna Gardner, Ryan Skay, John Doe Gardner, John & Jane Doe, Eric Nordman, Kyle Cannon, Lee Morgan, Justin Bangs, Zach Johns, Joshua Schneider, Craig Wade, Anders Tenney and Kootenai County
Case Number: 2:2019cv00311
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all counsel re #4 Notice of Appearance and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/18/2019. (ckh)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DONNA GARDNER AND JOHN DOE GARDNER, HUSBAND AND WIFE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO MODIFY CAPTION re #3 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Craig Wade, Ryan Skay, Donna Gardner, Jane Doe Bangs, Jacob Nielsen, Joshua Schneider, Kootenai County, Anders Tenney, Eric Nordman, City of Coeur d'Alene, Justin Bangs, Alley Ukich, Lee White, Zach Johns, Lee Morgan, Kyle Cannon. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Donna Gardner and John Doe Gardner, husband and wife are hereby dismissed from this cause of action, without prejudice, and the caption shall be modified to remove reference to Donna Gardner and John Doe Gardner, husband and wife. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (ckh)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Erbland on behalf of Jane Doe Bangs, Justin Bangs(as an agent of Coeur d'Alene Police Department), Justin Bangs(husband and wife), Kyle Cannon, City of Coeur d'Alene, Donna Gardner(as an agent of Kootenai County), Zach Johns, Kootenai County, Lee Morgan, Jacob Nielsen, Eric Nordman, Joshua Schneider, Ryan Skay, Anders Tenney, Alley Ukich, Craig Wade, Lee White (Erbland, Peter)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION of Dismissal and to Modify Caption by Jane Doe Bangs, Justin Bangs(as an agent of Coeur d'Alene Police Department), Justin Bangs(husband and wife), Kyle Cannon, City of Coeur d'Alene, Donna Gardner(as an agent of Kootenai County), Zach Johns, Kootenai County, Lee Morgan, Jacob Nielsen, Eric Nordman, Joshua Schneider, Ryan Skay, Anders Tenney, Alley Ukich, Craig Wade, Lee White. (Erbland, Peter)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alley Ukich and all other Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons Anders Tenney, #2 Summons City of Coeur d'Alene, #3 Summons Craig Wade, #4 Summons Donna Gardner and John Doe Gardner, #5 Summons Donna Gardner, #6 Summons Eric Nordman, #7 Summons Jacob Nielsen, #8 Summons John and Jane Doe, #9 Summons Joshua Schneider, #10 Summons Justin Bangs and Jane Doe Bangs, #11 Summons Justin Bangs, #12 Summons Kootenai County, #13 Summons Kyle Cannon, #14 Summons Lee Morgan, #15 Summons Lee White, #16 Summons Ryan Skay, #17 Summons Zach Johns) (ckh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1925333.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Alley Ukich, #9 Summons Anders Tenney, #10 Summons City of CDA, #11 Summons Craig Wade, #12 Summons Donna and John Doe Gardner, #13 Summons Donna Gardner, #14 Summons Eric Nordman, #15 Summons Jacob Nielsen, #16 Summons John and Jane Doe, #17 Summons Joshua Schneider, #18 Summons Justin and Jane Doe Bangs, #19 Summons Justin Bangs, #20 Summons Kootenai County, #21 Summons Kyle Cannon, #22 Summons Lee Morgan, #23 Summons Lee White, #24 Summons Ryan Skay, #25 Summons Zach Johns)(Sweetser, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins-Smithson et al v. City of Coeur d'Alene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Nielsen
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alley Ukich
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Lee White
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Bangs
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Coeur d'Alene
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Gardner
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Skay
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Nordman
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Cannon
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Morgan
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Bangs
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Johns
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wade
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anders Tenney
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kootenai County
Represented By: Peter C Erbland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Caswell-Smithson
Represented By: James R Sweetser
Represented By: James R. Sweetser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Wilkins-Smithson
Represented By: James R Sweetser
Represented By: James R. Sweetser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?