Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Higgins et al
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Defendant: United States Forest Service and Jeanne Higgins
Case Number: 2:2019cv00332
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ckh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Rebecca)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Rebecca)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (ckh)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF LITIGATION PLAN AND DISCOVERY PLAN, NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Unless the Plaintiff contacts the Courtroom Deputy, Lynette Case, and requests a different date and time, the Court will conduct an initial scheduling conference by telephone on NOVEMBER 5, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (MTN. TIME), to discuss the entry of a scheduling order to govern the case going forward. Stipulated Proposed litigation and discovery plans must be filed on or before OCTOBER 28,2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (ckh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for all parties re #1 Complaint and #4 Notice of Appearance. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/18/2019. (ckh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Tustin on behalf of All Defendants (Tustin, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jeanne Higgins, United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (ckh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Smith, Rebecca)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1933222.), filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Higgins Summons, #3 DOJ Summons, #4 USFS Summons, #5 CPC Summons)(Smith, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Higgins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?