Bohlman v. USA
Petitioner: Jeremy J Bohlman
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00366
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO EXTEND CURRENTLY SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Motion (Dkt. #8 ) is GRANTED. The briefing schedule currently set will be extended for a period of 120 days. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
October 15, 2019 NOTICE TO COURT that counsel Traci J. Whelan wishes to no longer be noticed electronically on this case as of the date of this notice. (Whelan, Traci)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Michael W Mitchell appearing for Respondent USA. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Mitchell, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Second MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( Criminal Action 2:15-cr-279-EJL.) by Petitioner Jeremy J Bohlman. (alw)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Michael W Mitchell for USA added. Attorney Traci Jo Whelan terminated. (Mitchell, Michael)
September 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Responses due by 10/25/2019 Replies due by 11/8/2019. (alw)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING MOTION PURSUANTTO 28 U.S.C. 2255. The United States shall file a written response to thepetitioner's motion within thirty (30) days from the date of this scheduling order. The petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days thereafter to file any reply brief. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER- Due to Judge Lodge taking inactive status, case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye for all further proceedings. Judge Edward J. Lodge no longer assigned to case. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct a Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Jeremy J Bohlman. (jp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit in Points and Authorities Attached to Bohlman's 28 U.S.C. 2255by Petitioner Jeremy J Bohlman. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (jp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( Criminal Action 2:15-cr-279-EJL.), filed by Jeremy J Bohlman.(jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohlman v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Traci Jo Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy J Bohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?