United States of America v. Howe et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: PHI Development LLC and Ebenezer K. Howe, IV
Case Number: 2:2019cv00421
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 1/2/2020.(Halasz, Ty)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 1/2/2020.(Halasz, Ty)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Ebenezer K. Howe, IV served on 11/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Halasz, Ty)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ebenezer K. Howe, IV and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #10 Answer to Complaint and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/11/2020. (ckh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for Appointment of Assistance of Counsel for Both Defendants: Howe (me) & "Phi Dev. LLC" by Defendants Ebenezer K. Howe, IV, PHI Development LLC. Responses due by 1/2/2020. (ckh)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to Complaint & Motion to Dismiss Due to Fraud on the Court & Unclean Hands of Gov't by Defendant Ebenezer K. Howe, IV (duplicate of filing at dkt #10 . Responses due by 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (ckh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2019: #7 Exhibit G) (ckh).
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint & Motion to Dismiss Due to Fraud on the Court & Unclean Hands of Gov't to #1 Complaint by Ebenezer K. Howe, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (ckh) Modified on 12/12/2019 to correct document title (ckh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2019: #7 Exhibit G) (ckh).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and #7 Motion Motion for Leave to Obtain CM/ECF Username and Password. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. #6 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Ebenezer K. Howe IV has until on or before December 16, 2019 to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's Motion for Leave to Obtain CM/ECF Username and Password (Dkt. #7 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Ebenezer K. Howe IV is directed to satisfy all of the requirements of the District of Idaho's Local Civil Rules and Electronic Case Filing Procedures, as amended July 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION Seeking Leave of Court to Obtain CM/ECF Username and Password, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 12/17/2019.(Halasz, Ty)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' Motion Seeking Leave of Court to Obtain CM/ECF Username and Password by Defendant Ebenezer K. Howe, IV. Responses due by 12/17/2019. (ckh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Ebenezer K. Howe, IV. Responses due by 12/17/2019. (ckh)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Halasz, Ty)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. PHI Development LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Halasz, Ty)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on February 3, 2020, at 10:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before January 27, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to all Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 PHI Development Summons) (ckh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ebenezer K. Howe, IV, PHI Development LLC, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Halasz, Ty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Howe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHI Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebenezer K. Howe, IV
Represented By: Ebenezer K Howe, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ty Halasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?