Jensen-Edwards v. US Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Jensen-Edwards
Defendant: Does 1-10, US Bank National Association, Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation and Robert W McDonald
Case Number: 2:2020cv00055
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: B Lynn Winmill
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ckh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Robert Harlan Scott appearing for Defendants Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, US Bank National Association. Responses due by 4/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit B - Corporate Assignments of Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit C - Edwards v. MERS, 154 Idaho 511 (2013), #5 Exhibit D - Amended Complaint in Case No. CV10-2745, #6 Exhibit E - BK Docket Case No. 14-20942-TLM, #7 Exhibit F - Adversary Complaint in Case No. 14-07025-TLM, #8 Exhibit G - Memorandum of Decision on MSJ in Case No. 14-07025-TLM, #9 Exhibit H - BK Docket in Case No. 17-20494-TLM, #10 Exhibit I - Alan Blunt Affidavit w.Exhibits)(Scott, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Robert Harlan Scott appearing for Defendants Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, US Bank National Association. Responses due by 4/3/2020 (Scott, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 Voluntary Dismissal re Quality Loan Service Corporation; and Robert W. McDonald, Esq. by Leslie Jensen-Edwards. (ckh)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendants must file a response to the Complaint on or before March 13, 2020. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Robert Harlan Scott appearing for Defendants Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, US Bank National Association. Responses due by 3/27/2020 (Scott, Robert)
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigants of the Summary Judgment Rule Requirement re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (ckh)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support by David Swartley re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert W McDonald, Quality Loan Service Corporation.(Swartley, David)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert W McDonald, Quality Loan Service Corporation.(Swartley, David)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss David M Swartley appearing for Defendants Robert W McDonald, Quality Loan Service Corporation. Responses due by 3/23/2020 (Swartley, David)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quality Loan Service Corporation. (Swartley, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William McDonald on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation (McDonald, Robert)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William McDonald on behalf of Robert W McDonald (McDonald, Robert)
February 20, 2020 NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ckh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Leslie Jensen-Edwards, Robert W McDonald and Quality Loan Service Corporation re #4 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance, and #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/20/2020. (ckh)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Swartley on behalf of Robert W McDonald (Swartley, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Swartley on behalf of Quality Loan Service Corporation (Swartley, David)
February 4, 2020 RECEIPT: Civil Filing Fee Received $ 400, receipt # 1635 (ckh)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert W McDonald, Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation, US Bank National Association. (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Summons Issued, filed by Leslie Jensen-Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(alw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen-Edwards v. US Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Robert Harlan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Systems, Inc
Represented By: Robert Harlan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Robert Harlan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: David M Swartley
Represented By: Robert William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W McDonald
Represented By: David M Swartley
Represented By: Robert William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Jensen-Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?