Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: The Lands Council, WildEarth Guardians, Idaho Conservation League, Center for Biological Diversity and Selkirk Conservation Alliance
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen, Chad Wolf, Jeanne Higgins, Robert Janson, U.S. Forest Service and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 2:2020cv00128
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Candy W Dale
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity, Idaho Conservation League, WildEarth Guardians, The Lands Council, & Selkirk Conservation Alliance. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Zaccardi, Andrea)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2020 11:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing- Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before 7/16/20, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) Modified on 4/6/2020 (jp).
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Center for Biological Diversity, Vicki Christiansen, Jeanne Higgins, Idaho Conservation League, Robert Janson, Selkirk Conservation Alliance, The Lands Council, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Forest Service, WildEarth Guardians, Chad Wolf re #6 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/2/2020. (jp)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun M Pettigrew on behalf of All Defendants (Pettigrew, Shaun)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vicki Christiansen, Jeanne Higgins, Robert Janson, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Forest Service, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(jp)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER Approving #3 Application for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Collette Adkins for Center for Plaintiffs. Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Collette Adkins. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2023394.)Andrea Lynn Santarsiere appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Idaho Conservation League, Selkirk Conservation Alliance, The Lands Council, WildEarth Guardians. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Santarsiere, Andrea)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Idaho Conservation League, Selkirk Conservation Alliance, The Lands Council, WildEarth Guardians. (Santarsiere, Andrea)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Forest Service, Vicki Christiansen, Jeanne Higgins, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Chad Wolf, Robert Janson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2023309.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity, WildEarth Guardians, Idaho Conservation League, The Lands Council, and Selkirk Conservation Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to defendant U.S. Forest Service, #3 Summons to defendant Vicki Christiansen, #4 Summons to defendant Jeanne Higgins, #5 Summons to defendant U.S. Customs and Border Protection, #6 Summons to defendant Chad Wolf, #7 Summons to defendant Robert Janson, #8 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #9 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Idaho)(Santarsiere, Andrea) Modified on 3/10/2020 to correct order of defendants and filers (ckh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen
Represented By: Shaun M Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Shaun M Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Higgins
Represented By: Shaun M Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Janson
Represented By: Shaun M Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Shaun M Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Shaun M Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lands Council
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Santarsiere
Represented By: Collette Adkins
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Zaccardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Santarsiere
Represented By: Collette Adkins
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Zaccardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Conservation League
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Santarsiere
Represented By: Collette Adkins
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Zaccardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Santarsiere
Represented By: Collette Adkins
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Zaccardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selkirk Conservation Alliance
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Santarsiere
Represented By: Collette Adkins
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Zaccardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?