Hrehor v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Michael Hrehor
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 2:2020cv00133
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Referring Judge: David C Nye
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Hrehor. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Kuznetz, Lawrence)
March 20, 2020 DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. Please use case number 2:20-cv-00133-SM on all future pleadings. (st)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr from the Eastern District of Washington. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney K. Cody Allison for Michael Hrehor Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by K. Cody Allison. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2025295.) Lawrence Jay Kuznetz appearing for Plaintiff Michael Hrehor. Responses due by 4/2/2020 (Kuznetz, Lawrence) Modified on 3/13/2020 (jd).
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by K. Cody Allison. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-2025295.)Lawrence Jay Kuznetz appearing for Plaintiff Michael Hrehor. Responses due by 4/2/2020 (Kuznetz, Lawrence)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2024392.), filed by Michael Hrehor. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Kuznetz, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hrehor v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hrehor
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Kuznetz
Represented By: K. Cody Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?