Kofalk et al v Vanderford et al
Plaintiff: Robert Kofalk, Teri Kofalk, Herbert T Vanderford, James Macdonald, MacDonald Law, P.C., Jeffrey Barnes and W.J. Barnes, P.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00238
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Idaho
Presiding Judge: Ronald E Bush
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Jeffrey Barnes, Robert Kofalk, Teri Kofalk, James Stephen MacDonald, MacDonald Law, P.C., W.J. Barnes, P.A. re #9 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 9/8/2020. (jp)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 Defendants James Stephen Macdonald and Macdonald Law, P.C. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James Stephen MacDonald, MacDonald Law, P.C..(Williams, Garrett)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett James Williams on behalf of James Stephen MacDonald, MacDonald Law, P.C. (Williams, Garrett)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Eric W Stokes appearing for Defendants Jeffrey Barnes, W.J. Barnes, P.A.. Responses due by 7/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stokes, Eric)
June 30, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Herbert Thomas Vanderford answer due 7/13/2020. (jp)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Herbert Thomas Vanderford on 06/27/20, filed by Robert Kofalk. (Points, Michelle)
June 26, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: James Stephen MacDonald answer due 7/9/2020; MacDonald Law, P.C. answer due 7/9/2020. (jp)
June 26, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jeffrey Barnes answer due 7/17/2020; W.J. Barnes, P.A. answer due 7/17/2020. (jp)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Macdonald on 06-18-2020, filed by Robert Kofalk. (Points, Michelle)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Barnes on 6-26-2020, filed by Robert Kofalk. (Points, Michelle)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: Plaintiff's counsel shall refer to Local Rule 4.1. (lc)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Barnes, James Stephen MacDonald, MacDonald Law, P.C., Herbert Thomas Vanderford. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(jp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2020: #4 Summons) (jp).
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Robert Kofalk. (Points, Michelle)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2049354.), filed by Robert Kofalk.(Points, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Idaho District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kofalk et al v Vanderford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kofalk
Represented By: Michelle R Points
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Kofalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert T Vanderford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacDonald Law, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.J. Barnes, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?